EP0716061 - Process for reductive deoxygenation by means of a redox catalyst [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [1996/24] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hagemeyer, Alfred, Dr. An der Froschlache 23 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
Rieker, Christopher William, Dr. Rheinvillenstr.26 D-68163 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
Lautensack, Thomas Gräfenthalstr. 2 D-67317 Altleiningen / DE | 04 /
Hermeling, Dieter, Dr. Am Wasserturm 19 D-67459 Böhl-Iggelheim / DE | [1996/24] | Application number, filing date | 95118341.7 | 22.11.1995 | [1996/24] | Priority number, date | DE19944443360 | 06.12.1994 Original published format: DE 4443360 | [1996/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0716061 | Date: | 12.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07B31/00, C07F9/50, C07C209/32 | [1996/24] | CPC: |
C07C209/36 (EP,US);
C07B31/00 (EP,US);
C07F9/509 (EP,US);
Y02P20/584 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1996/24] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur reduktiven Deoxigenierung mittels eines Redoxkatalysators | [1996/24] | English: | Process for reductive deoxygenation by means of a redox catalyst | [1996/24] | French: | Procédé de désoxygénation réductive au moyen d'un catalyseur redox | [1996/24] | Examination procedure | 29.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/24] | 01.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3354212 (DONARUMA LORRAINE G) [A] 1-9 * claim - *; | [DA]US3780111 (YOUNG D, et al) [DA] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0548682 (BASF AG [DE]) [DA] 1-9 * example -; claim - *; | [DA]DE2638720 (M & T CHEMICALS INC) [DA] 1-9 * example -; claim - *; | [DA]EP0005747 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [DA] 1-9 * example -; claim - *; | [DA]US4727193 (DOCKNER TONI [DE]) [DA] 1-9 * example -; claim - * |