blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0714924

EP0714924 - Self-emulsifying epoxy curing agent [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.05.2001
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip05.05.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.06.2001 [2001/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC.
7201 Hamilton Boulevard
Allentown, PA 18195-1501 / US
[1996/23]
Inventor(s)01 / Walker, Frederick Herbert
129 Pebble Woods Drive
Doylestown, PA 18901 / US
[1996/23]
Representative(s)Kador & Partner Part mbB
Corneliusstraße 15
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/23]Kador & Partner
Corneliusstrasse 15
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date95118570.124.11.1995
[1996/23]
Priority number, dateUS1994034516428.11.1994         Original published format: US 345164
[1996/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0714924
Date:05.06.1996
Language:EN
[1996/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0714924
Date:04.09.1996
[1996/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0714924
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.07.1996
ClassificationIPC:C08G59/50, C09D163/00
[1996/23]
CPC:
C08L63/00 (EP,US); C08G59/184 (EP,KR,US); C08G59/5026 (KR);
C09D163/00 (KR)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1996/23]
TitleGerman:Selbstemulgierender Härter für Epoxidharze[1996/23]
English:Self-emulsifying epoxy curing agent[1996/23]
French:Durcisseur autoémulsifiable pour résines époxydes[1996/23]
Examination procedure21.11.1996Examination requested  [1997/03]
07.09.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.01.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.04.2000Fee for grant paid
07.04.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.04.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
08.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0387418  (RUETGERSWERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-5,7,8,10-14,16,17,23-25 * examples 1,7,9,10,22; claims 1,4-6,13 * * page 3, line 9 - page 5, line 34 *;
 [D]US5032629  (HANSEN ACHIM [DE], et al);
 [A]EP0507735  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1,6,8 * claims 1-5,10 *;
 [DA]US5280091  (DUBOWIK DAVID A [US], et al) [DA] 9 * claim 1 * * column 6, line 19 - line 28 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.