EP0726379 - Double doors with controlled order of closing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/33] | Closure sequence controller for a double-wing door | ||
[2001/23] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 12.05.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DORMA GmbH + Co. KG Breckerfelder Strasse 42-48 58256 Ennepetal / DE | [2002/02] |
Former [1996/33] | For all designated states DORMA GmbH + Co. KG Breckerfelder Strasse 42-48 D-58256 Ennepetal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tillmann, Horst Siedlung Kohlstadt 4a D-58256 Ennepetal / DE | [1996/33] | Representative(s) | Hager, Thomas Johannes, et al Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | Hager, Thomas J., Dipl.-Ing. (FH), et al Hoefer, Schmitz, Weber & Partner Patentanwälte Gabriel-Max-Strasse 29 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95118601.4 | 25.11.1995 | [1996/33] | Priority number, date | DE19952001776U | 07.02.1995 Original published format: DE 29501776 U | [1996/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0726379 | Date: | 14.08.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0726379 | Date: | 09.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | E05F5/12 | [1996/33] | CPC: |
E05C17/18 (EP,US);
E05F3/22 (EP,US);
E05F3/221 (EP,US);
E05F5/12 (EP,US);
E05C7/06 (EP,US);
E05F2003/228 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/132 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1996/33] | Title | German: | Zweiflügelige Tür mit geregelter Schliessfolge | [2001/23] | English: | Double doors with controlled order of closing | [2001/23] | French: | Une porte à double battants dont la fermeture est assurée l'une après l'autre | [2001/23] |
Former [1996/33] | Schliessfolgeregler für eine zweiflügelige Tür | ||
Former [1996/33] | Closure sequence controller for a double-wing door | ||
Former [1996/33] | Coordinateur de fermeture des portes à double battants | Examination procedure | 18.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/37] | 22.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.10.2002
22.10.2002
ADMISSIBLE Gretsch-Unitas GmbH, Baubeschläge Johann-Maus-StraBe 3 D-71254 Ditzingen / DE Opponent's representative Dreiss, Uwe DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Gerokstrasse 1 70188 Stuttgart / DE | 02
09.10.2002
19.11.2002
ADMISSIBLE GEZE GmbH Reinhold-Vöster-Strasse 21-29 71229 Leonberg / DE Opponent's representative Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.10.2002
22.10.2002
ADMISSIBLE Gretsch-Unitas GmbH, Baubeschläge Johann-Maus-StraBe 3 D-71254 Ditzingen / DE Opponent's representative Dreiss, Uwe, Prof. Dr. jur. Dipl.-Ing. M.Sc. Patentanwälte Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker, Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
02
09.10.2002
19.11.2002
ADMISSIBLE GEZE GmbH Reinhold-Vöster-Strasse 21-29 71229 Leonberg / DE Opponent's representative Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | |||
Former [2003/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.10.2002
22.10.2002
ADMISSIBLE Gretsch-Unitas GmbH, Baubeschläge Johann-Maus-StraBe 3 D-71254 Ditzingen / DE Opponent's representative Dreiss, Uwe, Prof. Dr. jur. Dipl.-Ing. M.Sc. Patentanwälte Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker, Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
02
09.10.2002
19.11.2002
ADMISSIBLE GEZE GmbH Reinhold-Vöster-Strasse 21-29 71229 Leonberg / DE Opponent's representative Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | |||
Former [2002/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.10.2002
22.10.2002
ADMISSIBLE Gretsch-Unitas GmbH, Baubeschläge Johann-Maus-StraBe 3 D-71254 Ditzingen / DE Opponent's representative Dreiss, Uwe, Prof. Dr. jur. Dipl.-Ing. M.Sc. Patentanwälte Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker, Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
02
09.10.2002
19.11.2002
ADMISSIBLE GEZE GmbH Reinhold-Vöster-Strasse 21-29 71229 Leonberg / DE | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 22.11.2002 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.03.2003 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.11.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.11.2003 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 28.11.2003 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 28.09.2005 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2006/24] | 28.09.2005 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 23.01.2004 | Appeal received No. T0012/04 | 01.04.2004 | Statement of grounds filed | 21.02.2006 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 23.12.2003 | Appeal received | 28.09.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.03.2006 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.11.2002 | CH | 30.11.2002 | LI | 30.11.2002 | [2004/14] |
Former [2003/40] | CH | 30.11.2002 | |
LI | 30.11.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE3604091 (DORMA GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [DA] 1,6 * column 4, line 39 - column 6, line 41; figures 1-6 *; | [DA]DE4016283 (DORMA) [DA] 1,2,4 * column 3, line 60 - column 6, line 24; figures 1-5 *; | [DA]DE9209276U (DORMA) [DA] 1* figure 2; claim 1 * | by applicant | DE3604091 | DE4016283 | DE9209276U |