Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
30.04.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.06.1998 [1998/25] |
12.01.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
02.01.1998 | Surcharge for renewal fee | |
31.10.1997 | Period of grace (R.85b EPC1973) | |
18.04.1997 | Change - representative | published on 04.06.1997 [1997/23] |
07.02.1997 | Publication of search report | published on 26.03.1997 [1997/13] |
26.04.1996 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 12.06.1996 [1996/24] |