EP0715978 - Suspension strut metal-to-metal jounce stop [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.06.1998 [1998/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHRYSLER CORPORATION 12000 Chrysler Drive Highland Park Michigan 48288-1919 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/24] | For all designated states CHRYSLER CORPORATION 12000 Chrysler Drive Highland Park, Michigan 48288-1919 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carter, Robert L. 30081 Bayview Gibraltar, Michigan 48173 / US | 02 /
Barr, Sophia C. 1345 S. Bates Birmingham, Michigan 48009 / US | [1996/24] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/23] | Baillie, Iain Cameron c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/24] | Madgwick, Paul Roland Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95118721.0 | 28.11.1995 | [1996/24] | Priority number, date | US19940349297 | 05.12.1994 Original published format: US 349297 | [1996/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0715978 | Date: | 12.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0715978 | Date: | 26.03.1997 | [1997/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B60G13/00, B60G15/06 | [1996/24] | CPC: |
F16F9/58 (EP,US);
B60G15/062 (EP,US);
B60G2202/143 (EP,US);
B60G2202/312 (EP,US);
B60G2204/125 (EP,US);
B60G2204/128 (EP,US);
B60G2204/4104 (EP,US);
B60G2204/41044 (EP,US);
B60G2204/4108 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1996/24] | Title | German: | Federbein mit Metall-Metall-Anschlag | [1996/24] | English: | Suspension strut metal-to-metal jounce stop | [1996/24] | French: | Jambe de suspension avec butée de débattement métal-métal | [1996/24] | Examination procedure | 27.09.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/25] | 16.01.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1998/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 05.11.1997 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1997 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4747587 (FERREL TERRY J [US]) [DA] 1 * column 4, line 29 - line 36; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4397452 (FOUTS NORMAN G) [A] 1 * column 3, line 41 - line 45; figure 3 *; | [A]JPH0392636 ; | [A]DE4331585 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1,4 * column 2, line 43 - line 51; figure 1 *; | [A]US4805886 (HASSAN MORRIS [US]) [A] 1,4 * figure 1 *; | [A]US4219189 (SCRIVO JERRY V [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910710), vol. 015, no. 272, Database accession no. (M - 1134), & JP03092636 A 19910417 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | by applicant | US4465296 | US4747587 | US4478396 | US5078370 | US4934730 |