EP0716197 - Panel filled with polymeric foam [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.09.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.10.1998 [1998/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Röhm GmbH Kirschenallee 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/24] | For all designated states RÖHM GMBH Kirschenallee D-64293 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Benz, Volker, Dr. Am Dachsrain 13 D-64739 Höchst / DE | 02 /
Müller, Michael, Dr. Pater-Delp-Strasse 32 D-64625 Bensheim / DE | 03 /
Meier-Kaiser, Michael, Dr. Adam-Schwinn-Strasse 14 D-64319 Pfungstadt / DE | [1996/24] | Application number, filing date | 95118836.6 | 30.11.1995 | [1996/24] | Priority number, date | DE19944443558 | 07.12.1994 Original published format: DE 4443558 | [1996/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0716197 | Date: | 12.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0716197 | Date: | 07.05.1997 | [1997/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F16L59/00, E04C2/54 | [1997/16] | CPC: |
E04C2/543 (EP,US);
B29C48/07 (EP,US);
B29C48/11 (EP,US);
B29C48/313 (EP,US);
E04B1/80 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1996/24] | E04F13/00, F16L59/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/24] | Title | German: | Mit Polymerschaum gefüllte Profilplatten | [1996/24] | English: | Panel filled with polymeric foam | [1996/24] | French: | Panneau profilé rempli de mousse polymérique | [1996/24] | Examination procedure | 08.11.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/43] | 21.04.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1998/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.01.1998 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1997 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2909725 (KUNSTSTOFFABRIK ERICH DITTRICH) [Y] 1,3 * page 6, line 2 - page 8, line 13; figure 1 *; | [YA]EP0123091 (BM CHEMIE KUNSTSTOFF [DE]) [Y] 1,3 * siehe Seite 6 ersten Absatz *; page 4, line 26 - page 4, line 27 * * page 4, line 28 - page 4, line 34 * [A] 2; | [A]US4565723 (HIRSCH ELISABETH [AT]) [A] 1* column 2, line 27 - column 2, line 40; figure 2 * |