EP0776841 - Transporting device for piece goods and pallets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2000 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IBF FÖRDERTECHNIK IRMHILD HELGA FLOHR-CLEMENS Am Dickbusch 4 63825 Blankenbach / DE | [1997/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clemens, Horst G., Dipl.-Ing. Am Dickbusch 4 D-63825 Blankenbach / DE | [1997/23] | Representative(s) | Pöhner, Wilfried Anton Patentanwalt Dr. W. Pöhner Kaiserstrasse 33 Postfach 6323 97013 Würzburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/23] | Pöhner, Wilfried Anton, Dr. Postfach 63 23 97013 Würzburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 95118916.6 | 01.12.1995 | [1997/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0776841 | Date: | 04.06.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0776841 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/26 | [1997/23] | CPC: |
B65G47/268 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1997/23] | Title | German: | Transportbahn für Stückgüter und Paletten | [1997/23] | English: | Transporting device for piece goods and pallets | [1997/23] | French: | Transporteur pour marchandises de détail et palettes | [1997/23] | Examination procedure | 03.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/23] | 07.02.1997 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 27.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.1997 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 09.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1998 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   15.03.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 02.06.1999 | FR | 02.06.1999 | GB | 02.06.1999 | IT | 02.06.1999 | NL | 02.06.1999 | SE | 02.06.1999 | DK | 02.09.1999 | PT | 02.09.1999 | AT | 01.12.1999 | BE | 31.12.1999 | CH | 31.12.1999 | LI | 31.12.1999 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/32] | ES | 02.06.1999 | |
FR | 02.06.1999 | ||
GB | 02.06.1999 | ||
NL | 02.06.1999 | ||
SE | 02.06.1999 | ||
DK | 02.09.1999 | ||
PT | 02.09.1999 | ||
AT | 01.12.1999 | ||
BE | 31.12.1999 | ||
CH | 31.12.1999 | ||
LI | 31.12.1999 | ||
Former [2003/45] | ES | 02.06.1999 | |
GB | 02.06.1999 | ||
NL | 02.06.1999 | ||
SE | 02.06.1999 | ||
DK | 02.09.1999 | ||
PT | 02.09.1999 | ||
FR | 29.10.1999 | ||
AT | 01.12.1999 | ||
BE | 31.12.1999 | ||
CH | 31.12.1999 | ||
LI | 31.12.1999 | ||
Former [2003/08] | ES | 02.06.1999 | |
GB | 02.06.1999 | ||
NL | 02.06.1999 | ||
SE | 02.06.1999 | ||
PT | 02.09.1999 | ||
FR | 29.10.1999 | ||
AT | 01.12.1999 | ||
BE | 31.12.1999 | ||
CH | 31.12.1999 | ||
LI | 31.12.1999 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 02.06.1999 | |
GB | 02.06.1999 | ||
SE | 02.06.1999 | ||
PT | 02.09.1999 | ||
FR | 29.10.1999 | ||
AT | 01.12.1999 | ||
BE | 31.12.1999 | ||
CH | 31.12.1999 | ||
LI | 31.12.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | GB | 02.06.1999 | |
SE | 02.06.1999 | ||
PT | 02.09.1999 | ||
FR | 29.10.1999 | ||
AT | 01.12.1999 | ||
BE | 31.12.1999 | ||
CH | 31.12.1999 | ||
LI | 31.12.1999 | ||
Former [2002/02] | GB | 02.06.1999 | |
PT | 02.09.1999 | ||
FR | 29.10.1999 | ||
AT | 01.12.1999 | ||
BE | 31.12.1999 | ||
CH | 31.12.1999 | ||
LI | 31.12.1999 | ||
Former [2001/37] | GB | 02.06.1999 | |
PT | 02.09.1999 | ||
FR | 29.10.1999 | ||
AT | 01.12.1999 | ||
BE | 31.12.1999 | ||
Former [2001/08] | GB | 02.06.1999 | |
PT | 02.09.1999 | ||
FR | 29.10.1999 | ||
BE | 31.12.1999 | ||
Former [2001/05] | GB | 02.06.1999 | |
PT | 02.09.1999 | ||
FR | 29.10.1999 | ||
Former [2000/25] | PT | 02.09.1999 | |
FR | 29.10.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3034637 (SWEZEY EDWIN W, et al) [X] 1,2,6,7,9,11-13 * the whole document *; | [X]DE3612021 (WILL E C H GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,7,9 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2727638 (MAX KETTNER KELLEREIMASCHINENF) [A] 1,2,5,7 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3442978 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [A] 1-4 * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 13; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE3120939 (AXMANN NORBERT ING GRAD) [A] 1 * figures 1-9 * | [X] - "Stau-Kettenförderer", HOLZ ALS ROH- UND WERKSTOFF, BERLIN, DE, (199010), vol. 48, no. 10, page 400, XP000109922 [X] 1,5,7 * the whole document * |