EP0720995 - Liquid reactive thermosetting compositions and process for their crosslinking [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.09.1999 [1999/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENICHEM S.p.A. Piazza della Repubblica, 16 20124 Milano / IT | [1998/41] |
Former [1996/28] | For all designated states ENICHEM S.p.A. Piazza della Repubblica, 16 I-20124 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Parodi, Fabrizio Via C. Cabella, 27/8 I-16122 Genova / IT | 02 /
Gerbelli, Renata Viale Bligny, 29 I-20136 Milano / IT | 03 /
Demeuse, Mark 111 Cardinal Circle Hockessin, Delaware, 19707 / US | [1996/28] | Representative(s) | Gennari, Marco EniTecnologie S.p.A. Patent and Licensing Dept. Via F. Maritano, 26 20097 San Donato Milanese (MI) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/28] | Gennari, Marco Eniricerche S.p.A., BREL, Via F. Maritano, 26 I-20097 San Donato Milanese (MI) / IT | Application number, filing date | 95119101.4 | 05.12.1995 | [1996/28] | Priority number, date | IT1994MI02587 | 21.12.1994 Original published format: IT MI942587 | [1996/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0720995 | Date: | 10.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0720995 | Date: | 18.09.1996 | [1996/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0720995 | Date: | 07.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C08G59/42, C08G59/68, C07C255/13, C07C255/24, C07D295/088, C07D295/08 | [1996/35] | CPC: |
C07D295/088 (EP,US);
C07C255/13 (EP,US);
C07C255/24 (EP,US);
C08G59/24 (EP,US);
C08G59/42 (EP,US);
C08G59/686 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1996/28] | C08G59/42, C08G59/68, C07C255/13, C07C255/24, C07D295/088 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1996/28] | Title | German: | Flüssige, reaktive, wärmehärtbare Zusammensetzungen und Verfahren für ihre Härtung | [1996/28] | English: | Liquid reactive thermosetting compositions and process for their crosslinking | [1996/28] | French: | Compositions liquides réactives thermodurcissables et procédé pour leur durcissement | [1996/28] | Examination procedure | 06.09.1996 | New documents discovered [1996/44] | 15.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/11] | 11.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS51132280 ; | [X]FR1384206 (AGFA AG) [X] 17 * page 1, column 2, line 1 - page 3, column 1, line 48; example - *; | [A]US4033911 (SANDNER MICHAEL RAY, et al) [A] 17 * claims 1,2,5 *; | [A]US4293681 (MALIK EDWARD P) [A] 1,3,5 * column 1, line 62 - column 3, line 57; claim - *; | [PX]EP0655472 (ENIRICERCHE SPA [IT], et al) [PX] 1 * page 4, line 29 - page 9, line 30 * * page 11, line 27 - page 14, line 17; claim - *; | [A] - "AROMATIC BASE CURE EPOXY FIBRE IMPREGNATE MATERIAL POLYAMIDE RESIN VARNISH", DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 77, no. 01, Database accession no. 77-00917Y, XP002007162 & JPS51132280 A 19761118 (HITACHI) [A] 7 * abstract * |