EP0728986 - Socket for connecting a gas discharge lamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.10.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2001 | Refusal of application | published on 12.12.2001 [2001/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1996/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fabry, Thomas, Techniker Hafnergasse 3 D-72654 Neckartenzlingen / DE | 02 /
Kusserow, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Holdergasse 21 D-72820 Sonnenbuehl / DE | 03 /
Loeffler, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing.(FH) Junginger Strasse 4 D-72379 Hechingen / DE | 04 /
Mueller, Alexander, Meister Borsigstrasse 16 D-72760 Reutlingen / DE | [1996/35] | Application number, filing date | 95119114.7 | 05.12.1995 | [1996/35] | Priority number, date | DE1995202977U | 22.02.1995 Original published format: DE 29502977 U | [1996/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0728986 | Date: | 28.08.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F21M3/10, H01R13/66 | [1996/35] | CPC: |
H01R13/6625 (EP,US);
F21S41/17 (EP,US);
F21S41/192 (EP,US);
F21V25/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/35] | Title | German: | Stecker zur Kontaktierung einer Gasentladungslampe | [1996/35] | English: | Socket for connecting a gas discharge lamp | [1996/35] | French: | Douille pour connecter une lampe à décharge à gaz | [1996/35] | Examination procedure | 28.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/18] | 29.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.07.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2001/50] | 20.07.2001 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2001/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE4310307 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [AD] 1 * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 65; figure 6 *; | [A]DE4231538 (KOITO MFG CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 37 - column 5, line 16; figures 2-7 * | by applicant | DE4310307 |