28.12.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] |
17.02.2006 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
19.09.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] |
04.01.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] |
09.05.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] |
19.04.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] |
23.11.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.01.2002 [2002/02] |
28.07.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2001 [2001/37] |
20.04.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2001 [2001/23] |
12.01.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2001 [2001/09] |
05.01.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2001 [2001/08] |
29.12.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.02.2001 [2001/07] |
26.05.2000 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.07.2000 [2000/28] |
04.05.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.06.2000 [2000/25] |
11.06.1999 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.07.1999 [1999/30] |
09.04.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.01.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
21.01.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.12.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.12.1998 |
First examination report |
|
08.12.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
23.12.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.11.1996 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.01.1997 [1997/02] |
26.04.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.06.1996 [1996/24] |