Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0715931 | Global Dossier | 28.07.1999 | B1 | EP0715931 | 12.06.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE9419575 | 07.12.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE182503T | 15.08.1999 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE9419575 | 07.12.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59506463D1 | 02.09.1999 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE9419575 | 07.12.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE9419575U | 16.03.1995 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE9419575 | 07.12.1994 |