EP0715931 - Marking device for lathe workpieces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meibers, Gerhard Hauptstrasse 72 26897 Esterwegen / DE | [1999/30] |
Former [1996/24] | For all designated states Meibers, Gerhard Hauptstrasse 72 D-26897 Esterwegen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/24] | Representative(s) | Busse & Busse Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 12 26 49002 Osnabrück / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/24] | Busse & Busse Patentanwälte Postfach 12 26 49002 Osnabrück / DE | Application number, filing date | 95119201.2 | 06.12.1995 | [1996/24] | Priority number, date | DE19940019575U | 07.12.1994 Original published format: DE 9419575 U | [1996/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0715931 | Date: | 12.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0715931 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B25D5/00, B25H7/04, B27C7/04 | [1996/24] | CPC: |
B27C7/04 (EP);
B25D5/00 (EP);
B25H7/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/24] | Title | German: | Markiervorrichtung für Drechselwerkstücke | [1996/24] | English: | Marking device for lathe workpieces | [1996/24] | French: | Dispositif de marquage pour pièces à tourner | [1996/24] | Examination procedure | 15.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/02] | 10.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 28.07.1999 | FR | 28.07.1999 | GB | 28.07.1999 | GR | 28.07.1999 | IT | 28.07.1999 | NL | 28.07.1999 | SE | 28.07.1999 | DK | 28.10.1999 | AT | 06.12.1999 | BE | 31.12.1999 | CH | 31.12.1999 | LI | 31.12.1999 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | ES | 28.07.1999 | |
FR | 28.07.1999 | ||
GB | 28.07.1999 | ||
GR | 28.07.1999 | ||
NL | 28.07.1999 | ||
SE | 28.07.1999 | ||
DK | 28.10.1999 | ||
AT | 06.12.1999 | ||
BE | 31.12.1999 | ||
CH | 31.12.1999 | ||
LI | 31.12.1999 | ||
Former [2003/45] | ES | 28.07.1999 | |
GB | 28.07.1999 | ||
GR | 28.07.1999 | ||
NL | 28.07.1999 | ||
SE | 28.07.1999 | ||
DK | 28.10.1999 | ||
AT | 06.12.1999 | ||
FR | 24.12.1999 | ||
BE | 31.12.1999 | ||
CH | 31.12.1999 | ||
LI | 31.12.1999 | ||
Former [2003/08] | ES | 28.07.1999 | |
GB | 28.07.1999 | ||
GR | 28.07.1999 | ||
NL | 28.07.1999 | ||
SE | 28.07.1999 | ||
AT | 06.12.1999 | ||
FR | 24.12.1999 | ||
BE | 31.12.1999 | ||
CH | 31.12.1999 | ||
LI | 31.12.1999 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 28.07.1999 | |
GB | 28.07.1999 | ||
GR | 28.07.1999 | ||
SE | 28.07.1999 | ||
AT | 06.12.1999 | ||
FR | 24.12.1999 | ||
BE | 31.12.1999 | ||
CH | 31.12.1999 | ||
LI | 31.12.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | GB | 28.07.1999 | |
GR | 28.07.1999 | ||
SE | 28.07.1999 | ||
AT | 06.12.1999 | ||
FR | 24.12.1999 | ||
BE | 31.12.1999 | ||
CH | 31.12.1999 | ||
LI | 31.12.1999 | ||
Former [2002/02] | GB | 28.07.1999 | |
GR | 28.07.1999 | ||
AT | 06.12.1999 | ||
FR | 24.12.1999 | ||
BE | 31.12.1999 | ||
CH | 31.12.1999 | ||
LI | 31.12.1999 | ||
Former [2001/37] | GB | 28.07.1999 | |
GR | 28.07.1999 | ||
IE | 28.07.1999 | ||
AT | 06.12.1999 | ||
FR | 24.12.1999 | ||
BE | 31.12.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | GB | 28.07.1999 | |
GR | 28.07.1999 | ||
IE | 28.07.1999 | ||
FR | 24.12.1999 | ||
BE | 31.12.1999 | ||
Former [2001/09] | GB | 28.07.1999 | |
IE | 28.07.1999 | ||
FR | 24.12.1999 | ||
BE | 31.12.1999 | ||
Former [2001/08] | GB | 28.07.1999 | |
FR | 24.12.1999 | ||
BE | 31.12.1999 | ||
Former [2001/07] | GB | 28.07.1999 | |
FR | 24.12.1999 | ||
Former [2000/25] | FR | 24.12.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB142381 (HAROLD WILSON) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US1373367 (BOYD SUMMERS); | [A]US4084325 (JONES JR HIRAM) [A] 1 * column 1, line 32 - line 54 * * figures 1,2,7 * |