Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0721976 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2004 | B1 | EP0721976 | 09.10.1996 | A3 | EP0721976 | 17.07.1996 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE19500634 | 11.01.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19500634 | 29.08.1996 | C1 | Priority number | Date | DE19500634 | 11.01.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59510953D1 | 11.11.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE19500634 | 11.01.1995 |