EP0718641 - Drilling system with downhole apparatus for transforming multiple downhole sensor measurements into parameters of interest and for causing the drilling direction to change in response thereto [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAKER HUGHES INCORPORATED 3900 Essex Lane Suite 1200 Houston TX 77027 / US | [2008/36] |
Former [1996/26] | For all designated states BAKER HUGHES INCORPORATED 3900 Essex Lane Houston, Texas 77027 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wisler, Macmillan M. 1314 Golden Bear Kingwood, Texas 77380 / US | 02 /
Meyer Jr., Wallace H. 18307 Mahogany Forest Spring, Texas 77379 / US | 03 /
Deady, Ronald J. 6418 Castle Lane Drive Houston, Texas 77066 / US | 04 /
Leggett III, James V. 11518 Galbreath Drive Houston, Texas 77066 / US | 05 /
Minette, Daniel C. 6 Cloudleap Place The Woodlands, Texas 77381 / US | 06 /
Hubner, Bernard G. 51 Terravale Court The Woodlands, Texas 77381 / US | 07 /
Beimgraben, Herbert W. 2019 Roanwood Drive Houston, Texas 77090 / US | [1996/26] | Representative(s) | Finck, Dieter, et al V. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Patentanwälte Mariahilfplatz 2-3 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/26] | Finck, Dieter, Dr.Ing., et al Patentanwälte v. Füner, Ebbinghaus, Finck Mariahilfplatz 2 - 3 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95119573.4 | 12.12.1995 | [1996/26] | Priority number, date | US19940354276 | 12.12.1994 Original published format: US 354276 | US19950371882 | 12.01.1995 Original published format: US 371882 | [1996/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0718641 | Date: | 26.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0718641 | Date: | 09.06.1999 | [1999/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0718641 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01V11/00, E21B47/12, E21B47/00, E21B44/00, E21B7/06, E21B47/06, E21B47/022 | [1999/23] | CPC: |
E21B7/068 (EP,US);
E21B44/005 (EP,US);
E21B47/022 (EP,US);
E21B47/26 (EP,US);
G01V11/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/26] | G01V11/00, E21B47/12 | Designated contracting states | FR, GB, NL [1996/26] | Title | German: | Bohrungsanordnung mit Bohrlochgerät zur Übersetzung von Mehrfach-Bohrlochmessungen in interessierenden Parametern und zur Steuerung der Bohrrichtung. | [2003/02] | English: | Drilling system with downhole apparatus for transforming multiple downhole sensor measurements into parameters of interest and for causing the drilling direction to change in response thereto | [1996/26] | French: | Système de forage muni d'un dispositif dans le puits pour transformer des multiples mesures de capteurs en des paramètres d'intérêt utilisés pour controller la direction de forage | [2003/02] |
Former [1996/26] | Bohrungsanordnung mit Bohrlochgerät zur Übersetzung von Mehrfach-Bohrlochfühlermessungen in interessierenden Parameter und zur Veranlassung ansprechend darauf einer Veranderung von der Bohrrichtung | ||
Former [1996/26] | Arrangement de forage muni d'un dispositif dans le puits pour transformer des mesures de capteur dans le puits multiples dans des paramètres intéressants et pour initié en réponse la direction de forage | Examination procedure | 25.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/52] | 22.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US4403290 (CLAVIER CHRISTIAN M [US], et al) [Y] 21 * column 4, line 31 - line 41 * * column 5, line 50 - column 6, line 17; claim 1 * [A] 23-26; | [XD]US5163521 (PUSTANYK RANDAL H [CA], et al) [XD] 1,27,30 * column 3, line 30 - line 65 * * column 6, line 52 - line 61 * * column 8, line 15 - line 20 *; | [XY]WO9312318 (PATTON BOB J [US]) [X] 1-14,27-33 * page 11, line 4 - line 12 * * page 13, line 6 - line 25 * * page 19, line 16 - line 25 * * page 22, line 19 - page 23, line 18 * * page 26, line 23 - page 27, line 23 * * page 35, line 14 - page 37, line 20 * * page 40, line 9 - line 26; figure 1 * [Y] 15-22; | [YA]US5349528 (RUHOVETS NAUM [US]) [Y] 15-20,22 * column 7, line 20 - column 10, line 1; table 1 * * column 10, line 55 - column 11, line 15 * [A] 23-26; | [A] - "PARAMETERS MEASURED WHILE DRILLING GROW IN NUMBER AND QUALITY", PETROLEUM ENGINEER INTERNATIONAL, (19920501), vol. 64, no. 5, pages 37, 40 - 45, XP000270110 |