EP0717238 - Laminar flow burner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2000 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRAXAIR TECHNOLOGY, INC. 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury, CT 06810-5113 / US | [1996/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Snyder, William Joseph 2 Birchwood Rd. Ossining, New York 10562 / US | 02 /
Ding, Maynard Guotsuen 1409 Sunflower St. Yorktown, New York 10598 / US | 03 /
Semenza, Richard Thomas 1202 Dayton Lane Shrub Oak, New York 10541 / US | 04 /
Jackson, Johnny Dean 7 Misty Vale Rd. Sandy Hook, Ct. 06482 / US | [1996/25] | Representative(s) | Schwan, Gerhard Schwan Schwan Schorer Patentanwälte Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/25] | Schwan, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Elfenstrasse 32 81739 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95119586.6 | 12.12.1995 | [1996/25] | Priority number, date | US19940355129 | 13.12.1994 Original published format: US 355129 | [1996/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0717238 | Date: | 19.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0717238 | Date: | 23.10.1996 | [1996/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0717238 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F23D14/22, F23D14/32 | [1996/25] | CPC: |
F23D11/04 (KR);
F23D14/22 (EP,US);
F23D14/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, IT, NL, PT [1996/25] | Title | German: | Laminar-Strömungsbrenner | [1996/25] | English: | Laminar flow burner | [1996/25] | French: | Brûleur à écoulement laminaire | [1996/25] | Examination procedure | 31.10.1996 | Examination requested [1997/01] | 15.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 06.10.1999 | PT | 06.01.2000 | [2003/08] |
Former [2000/43] | PT | 06.01.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0340424 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [X] 1-3 * page 6, line 19 - line 30; figures 12,13 *; | [A]EP0571984 (PRAXAIR TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [A] 1-6 * column 5, line 40 - line 9; figure 1 *; | [A]US5100313 (ANDERSON JOHN E [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 4, line 10 - line 48; figures 1,3 *; | [A]EP0545440 (TOPSOE HALDOR AS [DK]) [A] 1,4 * the whole document * |