EP0717370 - Method of encapsulating a chipcard module and device for performing the method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 10.09.2003 [2003/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gemplus GmbH Mercedesstrasse 13 70794 Filderstadt / DE | [2002/19] |
Former [1998/46] | For all designated states ODS Landis & Gyr GmbH & Co. KG Ludwig-Erhard-Strasse 16 85375 Neufahrn / DE | ||
Former [1996/25] | For all designated states ODS, R. OLDENBOURG DATENSYSTEME GmbH Rosenheimer Strasse 145 D-81671 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Frank-Thomas, Dr.-Dipl.-Chem. Nordstrasse 16 D-99891 Fischbach / DE | 02 /
Schlöffel, Lutz, Dipl.-Ing. Am Stein 44 D-99846 Seebach / DE | [1996/25] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/25] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95119841.5 | 15.12.1995 | [1996/25] | Priority number, date | DE19944444812 | 15.12.1994 Original published format: DE 4444812 | [1996/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0717370 | Date: | 19.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0717370 | Date: | 19.02.1997 | [1997/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0717370 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077 | [1996/25] | CPC: |
H01L21/56 (EP);
G06K19/07745 (EP);
H01L2224/48091 (EP);
H01L2224/48227 (EP);
H01L2224/48472 (EP);
H01L2924/01068 (EP)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/48472, H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2224/48472, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, LI [1998/28] |
Former [1996/25] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Verkappen eines Chipkartenmoduls und Vorrichtung zum Durchführen des Verfahrens | [1996/25] | English: | Method of encapsulating a chipcard module and device for performing the method | [1996/25] | French: | Méthode d'encapsulage d'un module et dispositif pour la mise en oeuvre de la méthode | [1996/25] | Examination procedure | 16.01.1996 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, DK, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 10.07.1997 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/37] | 12.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.03.1996 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.1996 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.1996 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.1996 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.1996 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.1996 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.1996 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.1996 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.1996 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.1996 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.12.2001 | CH | 31.12.2001 | LI | 31.12.2001 | [2003/37] |
Former [2003/16] | CH | 31.12.2001 | |
LI | 31.12.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPS60142488 ; | [A]JPS6086850 ; | [Y]EP0390046 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 4,5,7-12 * column 7, line 50 - column 8, line 9; figures 4,6 *; | [DA]US4962415 (YAMAMOTO HIROSHI [JP], et al) [DA] 1 * column 4, line 36 - column 4, line 45 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851207), vol. 009, no. 312, Database accession no. (P - 411), & JP60142488 A 19850727 (DAINIPPON INSATSU KK) [X] 1-3 * abstract * [Y] 4,5,7-12 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850917), vol. 009, no. 230, Database accession no. (E - 343), & JP60086850 A 19850516 (DAINIPPON INSATSU KK) [A] 1,5 * abstract * | by applicant | US4962415 |