Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
09.04.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.05.1998 [1998/22] |
05.02.1998 | Surcharge for renewal fee | |
30.12.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
27.06.1997 | Examination report or reply | |
27.06.1997 | First examination report | |
18.10.1996 | Publication of search report | published on 04.12.1996 [1996/49] |
20.09.1996 | Change - classification | published on 06.11.1996 [1996/45] |
17.05.1996 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.07.1996 [1996/27] |
17.05.1996 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.07.1996 [1996/27] |