EP0719679 - Air bag apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.04.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.05.1998 [1998/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOKAI-RIKA-DENKI-SEISAKUSHO 1, Aza-Noda Ohaza-Toyota Ohguchi-cho Niwa Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/27] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOKAI-RIKA-DENKI-SEISAKUSHO 1, Aza-Noda Ohaza-Toyota Ohguchi-cho Niwa Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koide, Teruhiko, c/o K.K. Tokai-Rika-D.-Seisakusho 1, Aza-Noda, Ohaza-Toyota, Ohguchi-cho Niwa, Aichi-ken / JP | [1996/27] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/27] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf & Steimle Patentanwälte Gerokstrasse 6 70188 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 95119907.4 | 16.12.1995 | [1996/27] | Priority number, date | JP19940327851 | 28.12.1994 Original published format: JP 32785194 | [1996/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0719679 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0719679 | Date: | 04.12.1996 | [1996/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/22, B60R21/20, B60R21/16 | [1996/45] | CPC: |
B60R21/231 (EP,US);
B60R21/217 (EP,US);
B60R2021/23153 (EP,US);
B60R2021/23169 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/27] | B60R21/22 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/27] | Title | German: | Airbagvorrichtung | [1996/27] | English: | Air bag apparatus | [1996/27] | French: | Appareil de sac gonflable | [1996/27] | Examination procedure | 21.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/27] | 01.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/22] | 02.01.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/22] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1997 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3934588 (AUDI AG [DE]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 16; figures 2,3 *; | [A]DE8903786U (TAKATA CORP.) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5180188 (FRANTZ BRIAN H [US], et al) [A] 3,4,7-9 * column 2, line 51 - line 59 * * column 3, line 35 - line 57; figure 5 * |