EP0718753 - Data processing system for evaluating fuzzy logic rules and method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.1999 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.1999 [1999/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [1996/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Voit, James Greg 7816 Lakewood Drive Austin, Texas 78750 / US | [1996/26] | Representative(s) | Hudson, Peter David, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link, Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/26] | Hudson, Peter David, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 95119949.6 | 18.12.1995 | [1996/26] | Priority number, date | US19940363434 | 22.12.1994 Original published format: US 363434 | [1996/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0718753 | Date: | 26.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/00 | [1996/26] | CPC: |
G06N7/04 (EP,US);
G06F8/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/26] | Title | German: | Datenverarbeitungsanlage zur Evaluierung von "Fuzzy Logic"-Regeln und Verfahren dazu | [1996/26] | English: | Data processing system for evaluating fuzzy logic rules and method therefor | [1996/26] | French: | Système de processeur de données pour évaluer des règles "fuzzy logic" et méthode pour cela | [1996/26] | Examination procedure | 27.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/10] | 04.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/11] | 20.10.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XPA]US5386271 (MAEKAWA KAZUNOBU [JP], et al) [XP] 1,3 * column 13, line 56 - line 68; figure 24 * [AP] 2,4-10; | [XA]JPH0561283 (MINOLTA CAMERA KK) [X] 1,3 [A] 2,4-10; | [XA]EP0373628 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [X] 1,3 * column 13, line 15 - line 35; figure 10 * * column 14, line 3 - line 17 * * column 15, line 9 - line 18; figure 11 * [A] 2,4,5,10; | [A]EP0574713 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 2,4,5,10 * page 5, line 1 - line 5 * * page 5, line 33 - line 34; figure 3 * * page 8, line 39 - line 44; figure 6 * |