Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0827197 | Global Dossier | 11.12.2002 | B1 | EP0827197 | 11.03.1998 | A3 | EP0827197 | 04.03.1998 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP18638589 | 18.07.1989 | EP94117676 | 13.07.1990 | JP19782989 | 29.07.1989 | JP18629989 | 19.07.1989 | EP90113487 | 13.07.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0642168 | Global Dossier | 23.09.1998 | B1 | EP0642168 | 08.03.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP18638589 | 18.07.1989 | JP19782989 | 29.07.1989 | JP18629989 | 19.07.1989 | EP90113487 | 13.07.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0712162 | Global Dossier | 15.05.1996 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP18638589 | 18.07.1989 | JP19782989 | 29.07.1989 | JP18629989 | 19.07.1989 | EP95120043 | 13.07.1990 | EP90113487 | 13.07.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0350772 | 05.03.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | JP18638589 | 18.07.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0350874 | 05.03.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | JP18629989 | 19.07.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0362575 | 18.03.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | JP19782989 | 29.07.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR950014536B | 05.12.1995 | B1 | KR910003810 | 28.02.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | JP18638589 | 18.07.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR950014537B | 05.12.1995 | B1 | KR910003811 | 28.02.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | JP18629989 | 19.07.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR940008731B | 26.09.1994 | B1 | KR910003837 | 28.02.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | JP19782989 | 29.07.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0409107 | Global Dossier | 25.09.1996 | B1 | EP0409107 | 05.08.1992 | A3 | EP0409107 | 23.01.1991 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP18638589 | 18.07.1989 | JP19782989 | 29.07.1989 | JP18629989 | 19.07.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69028665T | 17.04.1997 | T2 | DE69028665D1 | 31.10.1996 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP18638589 | 18.07.1989 | JP19782989 | 29.07.1989 | JP18629989 | 19.07.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69032678T | 06.05.1999 | T2 | DE69032678D1 | 29.10.1998 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP18638589 | 18.07.1989 | JP19782989 | 29.07.1989 | JP18629989 | 19.07.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69034027T | 25.09.2003 | T2 | DE69034027D1 | 23.01.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP18638589 | 18.07.1989 | JP19782989 | 29.07.1989 | JP18629989 | 19.07.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5068697 | 26.11.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | JP18638589 | 18.07.1989 | JP19782989 | 29.07.1989 | JP18629989 | 19.07.1989 | Type | Earlier application | EP0409107 |