EP0727271 - Device for finely adjusting the lateral position of a pivotable scoring blade in a circular saw [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.1999 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.06.1999 [1999/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wilhelm Altendorf GmbH & Co. KG Wettiner Allee 43/45 D-32429 Minden / DE | [1996/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thiele, Siegfried Tannenweg 1 D-32429 Minden / DE | 02 /
Sensmeier, Jürgen Südbahnstrasse 87 D-32584 Löhne / DE | [1996/34] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/34] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 95120054.2 | 16.12.1995 | [1996/34] | Priority number, date | DE19940020807U | 23.12.1994 Original published format: DE 9420807 U | [1996/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0727271 | Date: | 21.08.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0727271 | Date: | 17.06.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B23D59/00, // B27G19/10 | [1996/34] | CPC: |
B23D59/002 (EP,US);
B27G19/10 (EP,US);
Y10T83/0215 (EP,US);
Y10T83/7726 (EP,US);
Y10T83/7872 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/34] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Feineinstellen der lateralen Position eines schwenkbaren Vorritzsägeblattes einer Kreissäge | [1996/34] | English: | Device for finely adjusting the lateral position of a pivotable scoring blade in a circular saw | [1996/34] | French: | Dispositif pour l'ajustement fine de la position latérale d'une lame de scie à inciser sur une scie circulaire | [1996/34] | Examination procedure | 09.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/41] | 13.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0189095 (REICH SPEZIALMASCHINEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * page 7, line 18 - page 8, line 10 * * figures 1,5,6 *; | [A]EP0455592 (STRIEBIG AG [CH]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 18 - line 25 * * column 3, line 33 - line 46 * * figures 1,2 *; | [DA] - S. HILDEBRAND, Feinmechanische Bauelemente, MUENCHEN (DE), CARL HANSER VERLAG, (1983), XP002000292 [DA] 1 * 4. stark bearbeitete Auflage; page 556 - page 557 * * page 598 - page 599 * |