EP0719703 - Minesweeping watercraft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 09.01.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FR. LÜRSSEN WERFT GmbH & Co. Friedrich-Klippert-Strasse 1 D-28759 Bremen / DE | [1996/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ortlepp, Peter Christianweg 24 D-24536 Neumünster / DE | [1996/27] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/27] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 95120055.9 | 16.12.1995 | [1996/27] | Priority number, date | DE19940020497U | 22.12.1994 Original published format: DE 9420497 U | [1996/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0719703 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0719703 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B63G7/06 | [1996/27] | CPC: |
B63G7/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1996/27] | Title | German: | Seeminenräumfahrzeug | [1996/27] | English: | Minesweeping watercraft | [1996/27] | French: | Chasseur de mines | [1996/27] | Examination procedure | 15.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/37] | 02.05.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.09.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.12.1998
04.01.1999
ADMISSIBLE ATLAS ELEKTRONIK GmbH Sebaldsbrücker Heerstr. 235 28305 Bremen / DE Opponent's representative Schulz, Klaus In der Bredenau 69 Fischerhude 28870 Ottersberg / DE | 02
11.12.1998
04.01.1999
ADMISSIBLE The State of the Netherlands Ministry of Defence Directorate of Legal Affairs P.O. Box 20701 2500 ES The Hague / NL Opponent's representative Hutter, Jacobus Johannes Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.12.1998
04.01.1999
ADMISSIBLE ATLAS ELEKTRONIK GmbH Sebaldsbrücker Heerstr. 235 28305 Bremen / DE Opponent's representative Schulz, Klaus In der Bredenau 69 Fischerhude D-28870 Ottersberg / DE | ||
02
11.12.1998
04.01.1999
ADMISSIBLE The State of the Netherlands Ministry of Defence Directorate of Legal Affairs P.O. Box 20701 2500 ES The Hague / NL Opponent's representative Hutter, Jacobus Johannes Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | |||
Former [2002/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.12.1998
04.01.1999
ADMISSIBLE STN ATLAS Elektronik GmbH Sebaldsbrücker Heerstr.235 28309 Bremen / DE Opponent's representative Schulz, Klaus In der Bredenau 69 Fischerhude D-28870 Ottersberg / DE | ||
02
11.12.1998
04.01.1999
ADMISSIBLE The State of the Netherlands Ministry of Defence Directorate of Legal Affairs P.O. Box 20701 2500 ES The Hague / NL Opponent's representative Hutter, Jacobus Johannes Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | |||
Former [1999/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.12.1998
04.01.1999
ADMISSIBLE STN ATLAS Elektronik GmbH Sebaldsbrücker Heerstr.235 28309 Bremen / DE | ||
02
11.12.1998
04.01.1999
ADMISSIBLE The State of the Netherlands Ministry of Defence Directorate of Legal Affairs P.O. Box 20701 2500 ES The Hague / NL Opponent's representative Hutter, Jacobus Johannes Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | |||
Former [1999/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.12.1998
04.01.1999
ADMISSIBLE STN ATLAS Elektronik GmbH Sebaldsbrücker Heerstr.235 28309 Bremen / DE | ||
02
11.12.1998
04.01.1999
ADMISSIBLE The State of the Netherlands Ministry of Defence Directorate of Legal Affairs P.O. Box 20701 2500 ES The Hague / NL | 21.01.1999 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.07.1999 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 16.05.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.07.2001 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 10.07.2001 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 24.10.2003 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2004/09] | Appeal following opposition | 11.09.2001 | Appeal received No. T1003/01 | 12.11.2001 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.12.2003 | Result of appeal procedure: REVOCATION OF PATENT AT PROPRIETOR'S REQUEST | 25.11.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]DE9420497U (FR LUERSSEN WERFT GMBH & CO [DE]) [XP] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE978056 (OTTENSENER EISENWERK GMBH, et al) [Y] 1-6 * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 18; figure -; claim - * * column 5, line 4 - line 14 *; | [Y]EP0130767 (SECR DEFENCE BRIT [GB]) [Y] 1-6 * claims 1,17 *; | [A]DE974576 (KOCH AUGUST G MASCHINEN) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - * |