EP0718049 - Method and apparatus for sorting paper sheets or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2003 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.09.2003 [2003/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/39] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | ||
Former [1996/26] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamashita, Taichiro 1-13-1204, Fujisaki-1-chome Tsuchiura-shi / JP | 02 /
Yoshida, Kazushi 3-10-104, Inayoshiminami-2-chome, Chiyodamashi Niihari-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 03 /
Hamada, Yasunori 9-22, Tatsumatashi Tsuchiura-shi / JP | 04 /
Tamamoto, Junichi 3-14-304, Inayoshiminami-2-chome, Chiyodamachi Niihari-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 05 /
Tajiri, Toshihiko 111-K-203, Haruokacho Higashi Owariasahi-shi / JP | [1996/26] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/26] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95120062.5 | 19.12.1995 | [1996/26] | Priority number, date | JP19940319766 | 22.12.1994 Original published format: JP 31976694 | [1996/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0718049 | Date: | 26.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0718049 | Date: | 28.01.1998 | [1998/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0718049 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B07C3/06, B07C3/02 | [1996/26] | CPC: |
B07C3/06 (EP,US);
B07C3/10 (KR);
B07C3/02 (EP,US);
Y10S209/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Sortieren von Papierblättern oder dergleichen | [1996/26] | English: | Method and apparatus for sorting paper sheets or the like | [1996/26] | French: | Procédé et appareil de tri de feuilles de papier ou analogues | [1996/26] | Examination procedure | 09.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/36] | 18.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5363971 (WEEKS HORACE W [US], et al) [A] 1-6,12-17 * column 8, line 46 - column 12, line 2; figures 4-7 *; | [A]DE4302231 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-4,12-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US4106636 (OUIMET RAYMOND JOSEPH, et al) [A] 5-11,16-21 * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 53; figure 1 * * column 7, line 32 - column 8, line 25; figure 2 * * column 9, line 26 - column 10, line 45; figure 3 *; | [A]WO9302810 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]) [A] 7-11,18-21 * page 6, line 5 - page 17, line 8; figures 1-3 * |