blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0720367

EP0720367 - Method and apparatus for identifying video fields produced by film sources [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.12.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip08.12.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.01.2001 [2001/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC.
10330 North Meridian St.
Indianapolis, IN 46206 / US
[1996/27]
Inventor(s)01 / Christopher, Todd J.
1402 South Kitley Avenue
Indianapolis / US
02 / Correa, Carlos
Lichtenberger Weg 4
Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
[1996/27]
Representative(s)Wördemann, Hermes, et al
Deutsche Thomson OHG
European Patent Operations
Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74
30625 Hannover / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/27]Wördemann, Hermes, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH, Patent Dept., Göttinger Chaussee 76
D-30453 Hannover / DE
Application number, filing date95120101.119.12.1995
[1996/27]
Priority number, dateUS1994036679130.12.1994         Original published format: US 366791
[1996/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0720367
Date:03.07.1996
Language:EN
[1996/27]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0720367
Date:19.11.1997
[1997/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0720367
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.09.1997
ClassificationIPC:H04N7/01
[1996/27]
CPC:
H04N7/0115 (EP,US); H04N3/10 (KR)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   PT [1996/27]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Identifizierung von durch Kinofilmquellen erzeugten Videohalbbildern[1996/27]
English:Method and apparatus for identifying video fields produced by film sources[1996/27]
French:Méthode et appareil d'identification des trames vidéo produites par des sources cinématographiques[1996/27]
Examination procedure05.05.1998Examination requested  [1998/27]
16.02.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.10.1999Fee for grant paid
20.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
18.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
12.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0542014  (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1,4,6,9 * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 45 *;
 [A]US5291280  (FAROUDJA YVES C [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 49; figure 3 * * column 8, line 3 - column 11, line 53; figures 8-11 *;
 [A]EP0588669  (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3,6-8 * page 7, line 16 - page 8, line 50; figure 9 *;
 [A]US5365273  (CORREA CARLOS [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 45; figures 1,6 *;
 [A]WO9430006  (FAROUDJA Y C [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 14 - page 3, line 10 * * page 7, line 20 - page 10, line 3 *;
 [A]  - KOIVUNEN T, "MOTION DETECTION OF AN INTERLACED VIDEO SIGNAL", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, (19940801), vol. 40, no. 3, pages 753 - 759, XP000471245 [A] 1,6 * page 753, paragraph 2.1 Motion Detector with One Field Memory *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/30.320867
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.