EP0722935 - Process for the purification of 5H-dibenzo-(b.f)-azepine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.02.2000 [2000/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM Fine Chemicals Austria GmbH St. Peter-Strasse 25 4021 Linz / AT | [1999/13] |
Former [1996/30] | For all designated states DSM Chemie Linz GmbH St.-Peter-Strasse 25 4021 Linz / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eichberger, Günter, Dr. Bergernstrasse 41 A-4512 Weisskirchen / AT | 02 /
Raml, Walter, Dr. Burggatter 28 A-4202 Hellmonsödt / AT | [1996/30] | Representative(s) | Lindinger, Ingrid DSM Fine Chemicals Austria GmbH CEL/Patente St. Peter-Strasse 25 4021 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/13] | Klostermann, Ingrid DSM Fine Chemicals Austria GmbH CEL/Patente St. Peter-Strasse 25 4021 Linz / AT | ||
Former [1996/30] | Kunz, Ekkehard, Dr. Agrolinz Melamin GmbH Patentabteilung, St. Peter-Strasse 25 A-4021 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 95120134.2 | 20.12.1995 | [1996/30] | Priority number, date | AT19940002408 | 27.12.1994 Original published format: AT 240894 | [1996/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0722935 | Date: | 24.07.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0722935 | Date: | 03.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07D223/22 | [1996/30] | CPC: |
C07D223/22 (EP,KR,US);
C07D223/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI [1998/51] |
Former [1996/30] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Reinigung von 5H-Dibenzo-(b,f)azepin | [1996/30] | English: | Process for the purification of 5H-dibenzo-(b.f)-azepine | [1996/30] | French: | Procédé de purification de 5H-dibenzo-(b,f)-azépine | [1996/30] | Examination procedure | 29.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/04] | 04.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1522192 (DEUTSCHE GOLD- UND SILBER-SCHEIDEANSTALT VORMALS ROESSLER) [A] 1-4* page 2, column 1, lines 14-28 *; | [A]CH442319 (GEIGY AG J R [CH]) [A] 1-4 * example 1 *; | [DA]EP0237952 (ORION YHTYMAE OY [FI]) [DA] 1-4 * page 3, lines 11-23; example 1 *; | [DA]EP0396134 (ALKALOIDA VEGYESZETI GYAR [HU]) [DA] 1-4 * page 5, lines 36-58 - page 6, lines 1-12 * | by applicant | EP0237952 | EP0396134 |