EP0719641 - Blanket cylinder for offset printing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.06.1998 [1998/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOENIG & BAUER-ALBERT AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/27] | For all designated states KOENIG & BAUER-ALBERT AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 D-97080 Würzburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Puschnerat, Helmut Wormser Strasse 21 D-67591 Wachenheim / DE | 02 /
Schröder, Peter Kantstrasse 14 D-67258 Hessheim / DE | [1996/27] | Application number, filing date | 95120137.5 | 20.12.1995 | [1996/27] | Priority number, date | DE19944447179 | 30.12.1994 Original published format: DE 4447179 | [1996/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0719641 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0719641 | Date: | 05.03.1997 | [1997/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B41F30/04 | [1996/27] | CPC: |
B41N10/06 (EP,US);
B41F30/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1996/27] | Title | German: | Gummituchzylinder für Offsetdruck | [1996/27] | English: | Blanket cylinder for offset printing | [1996/27] | French: | Cylindre porte-blanchet pour l'impression offset | [1996/27] | Examination procedure | 06.09.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/25] | 09.01.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1998/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.10.1997 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1997 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2803908 (CONTINENTAL GUMMI WERKE AG) [A] 1,2 * figures 1,2; claims 1,2 *; | [A]US3730092 (PICKARD J, et al) [A] 1,2 * column W *; | [DA]WO9309952 (DAY INT INC [US]) [DA] 1,2 * the whole document * |