EP0720274 - Balance corrector for a scanner motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/27] | Balance corrector for scanner motors and balance correcting method thereof | ||
[1999/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2001 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/27] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakasugi, Mikio, c/o Canon K.K. 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Fukita, Taku, c/o Canon K.K. 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Sato, Isshin, c/o Canon K.K. 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [1996/27] | Representative(s) | Weser, Wolfgang Weser & Kollegen Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/27] | Weser, Wolfgang Dres. Weser & Martin, Patentanwälte, Radeckestrasse 43 D-81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95120146.6 | 20.12.1995 | [1996/27] | Priority number, date | JP19940338255 | 27.12.1994 Original published format: JP 33825594 | JP19950239219 | 24.08.1995 Original published format: JP 23921995 | [1996/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0720274 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0720274 | Date: | 29.01.1997 | [1997/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0720274 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H02K15/16 | [1996/27] | CPC: |
H02K15/165 (EP,US);
F16F15/32 (EP,US);
G01M1/32 (EP,US);
G06K2207/1016 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/27] | Title | German: | Auswuchtungsvorrichtung für einen Abtastmotor | [1999/37] | English: | Balance corrector for a scanner motor | [1999/37] | French: | Dispositif d'équilibrage pour un moteur de balayage | [1999/37] |
Former [1996/27] | Auswuchtungsvorrichtung für Abtastmotoren und Auswuchtungsverfahren | ||
Former [1996/27] | Balance corrector for scanner motors and balance correcting method thereof | ||
Former [1996/27] | Dispositif d'équilibrage pour moteurs de balayage et procédé d'équilibrage | Examination procedure | 29.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/39] | 20.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 30.08.2000 | IT | 30.08.2000 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 30.08.2000 | |
Former [2002/02] | FR | 26.01.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH01219532 ; | [A]EP0606887 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 24 * * column 8, line 15 - column 8, line 38 ** figure - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891128), vol. 013, no. 533, Database accession no. (P - 967), & JP01219532 A 19890901 (SHIMADZU CORP) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * figure 1 * |