EP0720107 - Word retrieval apparatus for a dictionnary [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/27] | Dictionary retrieval apparatus | ||
[2000/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.2002 [2002/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/35] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | ||
Former [1999/09] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 545 / JP | ||
Former [1996/27] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morishita, Taro 3-1-31-6, Sanjyooji Nara-shi, Nara / JP | [1996/27] | Representative(s) | Müller, Frithjof E., et al Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte MÜLLER & HOFFMANN, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/27] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95120459.3 | 22.12.1995 | [1996/27] | Priority number, date | JP19940322764 | 26.12.1994 Original published format: JP 32276494 | [1996/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0720107 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0720107 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [1996/27] | CPC: |
G06F16/9017 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/27] | Title | German: | Wort-Wiederauffindungsapparat für ein Wörterbuch | [2000/46] | English: | Word retrieval apparatus for a dictionnary | [2000/46] | French: | Système de stockage des mots d'un dictionnaire | [2000/46] |
Former [1996/27] | Wörterbuch-Wiederauffindungsapparat | ||
Former [1996/27] | Dictionary retrieval apparatus | ||
Former [1996/27] | Système de recouvrement à dictionnaire | Examination procedure | 04.10.1996 | Examination requested [1996/49] | 11.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPS61285573 ; | [DA]JPH0554077 ; | [DA]JPH03127254 ; | [A]EP0369829 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1* abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870516), vol. 011, no. 151, Database accession no. (P - 576), & JP61285573 A 19861216 (RICOH CO LTD) [DA] 1-9 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930709), vol. 017, no. 366, Database accession no. (P - 1571), & JP05054077 A 19930305 (NEC CORP) [DA] 1-9 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910829), vol. 015, no. 342, Database accession no. (P - 1244), & JP03127254 A 19910530 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [DA] 1-9 * abstract * |