EP0719758 - Process for the production of aromatic olefines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Celanese GmbH Lurgiallee 14 60439 Frankfurt / DE | [1998/22] |
Former [1996/27] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herrmann, Wolfgang A., Prof. Dr. Gartenstrasse 69c D-85354 Freising / DE | 02 /
Fischer, Jakob Blumenstrasse 19 D-85414 Kirchdorf / DE | 03 /
Elison, Martina Augustenstrasse 101 D-80798 München / DE | 04 /
Köcher, Christian Wandletstrasse 9 D-80805 München / DE | [1996/27] | Application number, filing date | 95120589.7 | 27.12.1995 | [1996/27] | Priority number, date | DE19944447068 | 29.12.1994 Original published format: DE 4447068 | [1996/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0719758 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0719758 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07C67/343, C07C69/738, C07C69/734, C07C69/618, C07C205/56, C07C41/30, C07C43/243, C07C45/68, C07C49/794, C07C49/217, C07C49/255, C07C205/06, C07C47/548, C07C49/796 | [1996/27] | CPC: |
B01J31/2265 (EP,US);
C07C69/734 (KR);
B01J31/2273 (EP,US);
C07B37/04 (EP,US);
C07C17/266 (EP,US);
C07C201/12 (EP,US);
C07C227/16 (EP,US);
C07C41/30 (EP,US);
C07C45/68 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C201/12, C07C205/06 (EP,US);
C07C201/12, C07C205/56 (EP,US);
C07C227/16, C07C229/44 (US,EP);
C07C41/30, C07C43/215 (EP,US);
C07C67/343, C07C69/618 (US,EP);
C07C67/343, C07C69/734 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1996/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung aromatischer Olefine | [1996/27] | English: | Process for the production of aromatic olefines | [1996/27] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'oléfines aromatiques | [1996/27] | Examination procedure | 03.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/11] | 24.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 30.12.1998 | GR | 30.12.1998 | IE | 30.12.1998 | DK | 30.03.1999 | PT | 30.03.1999 | SE | 30.03.1999 | [2003/45] |
Former [2002/31] | ES | 30.12.1998 | |
GR | 30.12.1998 | ||
IE | 30.12.1998 | ||
PT | 30.03.1999 | ||
SE | 30.03.1999 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 30.12.1998 | |
GR | 30.12.1998 | ||
PT | 30.03.1999 | ||
SE | 30.03.1999 | ||
IE | 20.08.1999 | ||
Former [2002/10] | GR | 30.12.1998 | |
PT | 30.03.1999 | ||
SE | 30.03.1999 | ||
IE | 20.08.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | GR | 30.12.1998 | |
IE | 30.12.1998 | ||
PT | 30.03.1999 | ||
SE | 30.03.1999 | ||
Former [2000/27] | IE | 30.12.1998 | |
PT | 30.03.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | PT | 30.03.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0103544 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1 * page 7, paragraph 3 - page 9, paragraph 1 * * page 10 - page 21; example - * * page 22 - page 25; claim - *; | [A]WO9301173 (YEDA RES & DEV [IL]) [A] 1 * page 5 - page 7; example - ** page 8 - page 9; claim - * |