EP0719853 - Fluid composition for use in fluid coupling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.09.2001 [2001/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TonenGeneral Sekiyu K.K. 16-1 1-chome Kaigan Minato-Ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/45] | For all designated states TonenGeneral Sekiyu K.K. 16-1 1-chome Kaigan Minato-Ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1996/27] | For all designated states Tonen Corporation 1-1 Hitotsubashi, 1-Chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Katoh, Tomohiro, c/o Tonen Corp. Corp Res and Dev Lab, 3-1, Nishitsurugaoka 1-chome Ohi-machi, Irumagun, Saitama-ken, 356 / JP | 02 /
Oenoki, Hitoshi, c/o Tonen Corp. Corp Res and Dev Lab, 3-1, Nishitsurugaoka 1-chome Ohi-machi, Irumagun, Saitama-ken, 356 / JP | 03 /
Ueda, Hironari, c/o Tonen Corp. Corp Res and Dev Lab, 3-1, Nishitsurugaoka 1-chome Ohi-machi, Irumagun, Saitama-ken, 356 / JP | 04 /
Arai, Mikirou, c/o Tonen Corp. Corp Res and Dev Lab, 3-1, Nishitsurugaoka 1-chome Ohi-machi, Irumagun, Saitama-ken, 356 / JP | 05 /
Kuribayashi, Toshiaki, c/o Tonen Corp. Corp Res and Dev Lab, 3-1, Nishitsurugaoka 1-chome Ohi-machi, Irumagun, Saitama-ken, 356 / JP | [1996/27] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/27] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95120603.6 | 27.12.1995 | [1996/27] | Priority number, date | JP19940339960 | 27.12.1994 Original published format: JP 33996094 | [1996/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0719853 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0719853 | Date: | 24.07.1996 | [1996/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0719853 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C10M159/18, C10M169/04, // (C10M169/04, 107:50, 133:12, 133:44, 137:02, 159:18), C10N10:16, C10N20:02, C10N30:08, C10N30:10, C10N40:04 | [1996/30] | CPC: |
C10M169/045 (EP,US);
C10M107/50 (EP,US);
C10M133/12 (EP,US);
C10M133/44 (EP,US);
C10M137/02 (EP,US);
C10M159/18 (EP,US);
C10M169/042 (EP,US);
C10M2207/024 (EP,US);
C10M2207/026 (EP,US);
C10M2207/09 (EP,US);
C10M2207/123 (EP,US);
C10M2207/125 (EP,US);
C10M2207/129 (EP,US);
C10M2207/14 (EP,US);
C10M2207/142 (EP,US);
C10M2207/16 (EP,US);
C10M2207/22 (EP,US);
C10M2207/281 (EP,US);
C10M2207/282 (EP,US);
C10M2207/283 (EP,US);
C10M2207/286 (EP,US);
C10M2207/289 (EP,US);
C10M2215/04 (EP,US);
C10M2215/06 (EP,US);
C10M2215/062 (EP,US);
C10M2215/064 (EP,US);
C10M2215/065 (EP,US);
C10M2215/066 (EP,US);
C10M2215/067 (EP,US);
C10M2215/068 (EP,US);
C10M2215/22 (EP,US);
C10M2215/221 (EP,US);
C10M2215/223 (EP,US);
C10M2215/225 (EP,US);
C10M2215/226 (EP,US);
C10M2215/26 (EP,US);
C10M2215/30 (EP,US);
C10M2219/087 (EP,US);
C10M2219/088 (EP,US);
C10M2219/089 (EP,US);
C10M2219/10 (EP,US);
C10M2219/102 (EP,US);
C10M2219/104 (EP,US);
C10M2219/106 (EP,US);
C10M2219/108 (EP,US);
C10M2223/02 (EP,US);
C10M2223/04 (EP,US);
C10M2223/041 (EP,US);
C10M2223/042 (EP,US);
C10M2223/047 (EP,US);
C10M2223/049 (EP,US);
C10M2223/10 (EP,US);
C10M2227/081 (EP,US);
C10M2227/09 (EP,US);
C10M2229/025 (EP,US);
C10M2229/04 (EP,US);
C10M2229/0405 (EP,US);
C10M2229/041 (EP,US);
C10M2229/0415 (EP,US);
C10M2229/042 (EP,US);
C10M2229/0425 (EP,US);
C10M2229/043 (EP,US);
C10M2229/0435 (EP,US);
C10M2229/044 (EP,US);
C10M2229/0445 (EP,US);
C10M2229/0455 (EP,US);
C10M2229/0465 (EP,US);
C10M2229/0475 (EP,US);
C10M2229/0485 (EP,US);
C10M2229/0505 (EP,US);
C10M2229/051 (EP,US);
C10M2229/0515 (EP,US);
C10M2229/0525 (EP,US);
C10M2229/0535 (EP,US);
C10M2229/0545 (EP,US);
C10N2010/00 (EP,US);
C10N2010/06 (EP,US);
C10N2010/14 (EP,US);
C10N2010/16 (EP,US);
C10N2020/01 (EP,US);
C10N2040/04 (EP,US);
C10N2040/042 (EP,US);
C10N2040/044 (EP,US);
C10N2040/046 (EP,US);
C10N2040/08 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1996/27] | C10M169/04, C10M163/00, C10M159/18, // (C10M169/04, 107:50, 133:12, 133:44, 137:02, 159:18),(C10M163/00, 133:12, 133:44, 137:02, 159:18), C10N30:04, C10N30:06, C10N40:04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/09] |
Former [1996/27] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Flüssige Zusammensetzung zur Anwendung in einer Fluidkupplung | [1996/27] | English: | Fluid composition for use in fluid coupling | [1996/27] | French: | Composition fluide pour utilisation dans une couple hydraulique | [1996/27] | Examination procedure | 12.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/02] | 02.12.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 02.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.1999 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 08.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.03.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DXY]US2979482 (PICCOLI WILLIAM A) [DX] 1,2 * column 1, line 55 - line 57 * * column 5, line 53 - line 55 * * column 6, line 24 - line 25 * [Y] 5-9; | [Y]EP0462777 (TONEN CORP [JP]) [Y] 5-9 * page 12; examples 9,10 * * page 8, line 45 - line 46 * * page 5, line 1 *; | [Y]JPH0273895 ; | [A]GB1088352 (MONSANTO CO) [A] 1,2 * page 1, line 70 - line 80 * * page 2, line 36 - line 38 *; | [A]JPS5281080 ; | [A]US3745129 (BROWN E, et al) [A] 1-11 * claim 1 *; | [A]FR1186850 (DOW CORNING [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH04202297 | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 16, Database accession no. 90-121455, XP002004238 & JPH0273895 A 19900313 (TOA NENRYO KOGYO KK) [Y] 5,6 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 77, no. 34, Database accession no. 77-59893Y, XP002004239 & JPS5281080 A 19770707 (SHINETSU CHEM IND KK) [A] 1-11 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 36, Database accession no. 92-295465, XP002004240 & JPH04202297 A 19920723 (TONEN CORP) [A] 1-11 * abstract * |