EP0664948 - A tedding machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2004 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 29.12.2004 [2004/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAASLAND N.V. Weverskade 10 3155 PD Maasland / NL | [2003/38] |
Former [1995/31] | For all designated states MAASLAND N.V. Weverskade 10 NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van der Lely, Cornelis 7, Brüschenrain CH-6300 Zug / CH | [1995/31] | Representative(s) | Corten, Maurice Jean F.M., et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Cornelis van der Lelylaan 1 3147 PB Maassluis / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/48] | Corten, Maurice Jean F.M., et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 3155 PD Maasland / NL | ||
Former [1995/31] | Mulder, Herman, et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL | Application number, filing date | 95200181.6 | 26.01.1995 | [1995/31] | Priority number, date | NL19940000133 | 28.01.1994 Original published format: NL 9400133 | [1995/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0664948 | Date: | 02.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0664948 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A01D78/10 | [1995/31] | CPC: |
A01D78/1014 (EP);
A01D78/1085 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1995/31] | Title | German: | Heuwerbungsmaschine | [1995/31] | English: | A tedding machine | [1995/31] | French: | Machine de fenaison | [1995/31] | Examination procedure | 24.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/12] | 06.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP97203629.7 / EP0848900 | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 17.09.2003 | GB | 26.01.2004 | [2005/01] |
Former [2004/13] | NL | 17.09.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE9315879U (GREENLAND GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,9,10 * page 4, line 14 - line 18; figure 1 * * page 6, paragraph 2 - page 7, paragraph 2 * [A] 4; | [A]EP0385899 (KUHN SA [FR]) [A] 7,8,11,12 * column 1, line 34 - line 56 * * column 2, line 40 - line 53 * * column 3, line 21 - line 29 * * column 5, line 37 - column 6, line 30 *; | [XA]EP0165638 (MULTINORM BV [NL]) [X] 14 * page 5, paragraph 4 - page 7, paragraph 1 * [A] 13,16; | [A]FR2663189 (KUHN SA [FR]); | [A]FR2375814 (FORTSCHRITT VEB K [DD]); | [A]NL7604451 (TEXAS INDUSTRIES INC); | [A]EP0492620 (MAIER HELMUT [DE], et al); | [A]DE3628605 (FELLA WERKE GMBH [DE]); | [A]US3638977 (PURRER JOSEF); | [A]WO9118497 (ROTACON ENG LTD [NZ], et al) | Examination | DE9315877U | DE9216498U |