EP0681275 - System for emitting an alarm on command, in particular in the case of robbery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.07.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2000 | Refusal of application | published on 23.08.2000 [2000/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Broglia, Roberto 16, Via Previati I-21100 Varese / IT | [1995/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/45] | Representative(s) | Corradini, Corrado, et al Ing. C. Corradini & C. S.r.l. Via Dante Alighieri 4 42100 Reggio Emilia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/45] | Corradini, Corrado, et al Studio Ing. C. CORRADINI & C. S.r.l. 4, Via Dante Alighieri I-42100 Reggio Emilia / IT | Application number, filing date | 95200919.9 | 12.04.1995 | [1995/45] | Priority number, date | IT1994RE00034 | 04.05.1994 Original published format: IT RE940034 | [1995/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0681275 | Date: | 08.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G08B21/00 | [1995/45] | CPC: |
G08B21/0297 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/45] | Extension states | LT | 11.04.1995 | SI | 11.04.1995 | Title | German: | System zum gesteuerten Aussenden von einem Alarm, insbesondere bei Diebstahl | [1995/45] | English: | System for emitting an alarm on command, in particular in the case of robbery | [1995/45] | French: | Système de vol d'émission d'alarme sur commande notamment en cas | [1995/45] | Examination procedure | 08.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/34] | 08.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 31.03.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2000/34] | 10.04.2000 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2000/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1997 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   06.08.1997 | 30.04.2000 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2411046 (MERTE WALTER) [A] 2* claims 1,2 *; | [Y]FR2598535 (LAUDREN CIE SA ETS M [FR]) [Y] 1 * abstract *; | [Y]FR2600802 (SORANZO ROGER [FR]) [Y] 1 * claims 1,2 * |