EP0688881 - Method for adding traces of sodium to a melt of aluminium or an aluminium alloy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.06.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.1999 | Refusal of application | published on 04.08.1999 [1999/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states "VLAAMSE INSTELLING VOOR TECHNOLOGISCH ONDERZOEK", afgekort "V.I.T.O." Boeretang 200 2400 Mol / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/52] | For all designated states "VLAAMSE INSTELLING VOOR TECHNOLOGISCH ONDERZOEK", afgekort "V.I.T.O." Boeretang 200 B-2400 Mol / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fray, D. J., Prof. Evergreen Cottage Kirk Deighton, Nr Wetherby, LS22 4DZ / GB | 02 /
Doughty, G., Dr. 20 Cliffe Mount Leeds, LS6 4DZ / GB | 03 /
Van Der Poorten, Christian Jean Marie E. C. Professor Devochtstraat 58 B-2300 Turnhout / BE | 04 /
Dekeyser, Jacky C. Schansstraat 11 B-3910 Neerpelt / BE | [1995/52] | Representative(s) | Debrabandere, René Bureau De Rycker nv Arenbergstraat 13 2000 Antwerpen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/52] | Debrabandere, René Bureau De Rycker nv Arenbergstraat 13 B-2000 Antwerpen / BE | Application number, filing date | 95200958.7 | 15.04.1995 | [1995/52] | Priority number, date | BE19940000481 | 09.05.1994 Original published format: BE 9400481 | [1995/52] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0688881 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C22C21/04, C22C1/02, C25C3/24 | [1995/52] | CPC: |
C25C3/02 (EP);
C22C21/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1995/52] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Zusetzen von Natrium-Spuren zu Aluminium- oder Aluminium-Legierungsschmelzen | [1995/52] | English: | Method for adding traces of sodium to a melt of aluminium or an aluminium alloy | [1995/52] | French: | Procédé pour ajouter des traces de sodium dans des bains d'aluminium où alliage d'aluminium en fusion | [1995/52] | Examination procedure | 18.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/21] | 10.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1999/31] | 11.03.1999 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1999/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0497410 (STUDIECENTRUM VOOR KERNENERGIE) [DA] 1-4 * claims 1-6 *; | [A]EP0446152 (ALUMINIUM PECHINEY) | [A] - M.SUN ET AL, "ACTIVITY OF SODIUM IN LIQUID ALUMINIUM", METADEX, ASM/IOM [A] 1 * abstract * | [ ] - JOURNAL OF CENTRAL-SOUTH INSTITUTE OF MINING AND METALLURGY (CHINA), vol. 23, no. 1, pages 99 - 104 |