Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0429258 | Global Dossier | 24.04.1996 | B1 | EP0429258 | 29.04.1992 | A3 | EP0429258 | 29.05.1991 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US43795289 | 17.11.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU643955B | Global Dossier | 02.12.1993 | B2 | AU6667990 | 23.05.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | US43795289 | 17.11.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0668703 | Global Dossier | 20.01.1999 | B1 | EP0668703 | 04.10.1995 | A3 | EP0668703 | 23.08.1995 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US43795289 | 17.11.1989 | US59239790 | 03.10.1990 | EP90312507 | 16.11.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE137378T | 15.05.1996 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US43795289 | 17.11.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2029554 | 18.05.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US43795289 | 17.11.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2029555 | 18.05.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US43795289 | 17.11.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1033734C | 01.01.1997 | C | CN1051835 | 29.05.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | US43795289 | 17.11.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69026684T | 12.12.1996 | T2 | DE69026684D1 | 30.05.1996 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US43795289 | 17.11.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0429258T | 13.05.1996 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US43795289 | 17.11.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2086380T | 01.07.1996 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US43795289 | 17.11.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI98260C | 12.05.1997 | C | FI98260B | 31.01.1997 | B | FI905581 | 18.05.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | US43795289 | 17.11.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3196118B | 06.08.2001 | B2 | JPH03175717 | 30.07.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | US43795289 | 17.11.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100227244B | 01.11.1999 | B1 | KR910011063 | 29.06.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | US43795289 | 17.11.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY105283 | 30.09.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US43795289 | 17.11.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT95922 | 31.07.1998 | B | PT95922 | 31.08.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | US43795289 | 17.11.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG79900 | 17.04.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US43795289 | 17.11.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TR25547 | 01.05.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | US43795289 | 17.11.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5005074 | 02.04.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | US43795289 | 17.11.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0434209 | Global Dossier | 08.05.1996 | B1 | EP0434209 | 29.04.1992 | A3 | EP0434209 | 26.06.1991 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US43795289 | 17.11.1989 | US59239790 | 03.10.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69026913T | 28.11.1996 | T2 | DE69026913D1 | 13.06.1996 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US43795289 | 17.11.1989 | US59239790 | 03.10.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69032912T | 02.06.1999 | T2 | DE69032912D1 | 04.03.1999 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US43795289 | 17.11.1989 | US59239790 | 03.10.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2086381T | 01.07.1996 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US43795289 | 17.11.1989 | US59239790 | 03.10.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2126204T | 16.03.1999 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US43795289 | 17.11.1989 | US59239790 | 03.10.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3196119B | 06.08.2001 | B2 | JPH03211990 | 17.09.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | US43795289 | 17.11.1989 | US59239790 | 03.10.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100220113B | 01.09.1999 | B1 | KR910011065 | 29.06.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | US43795289 | 17.11.1989 | US59239790 | 03.10.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG93775 | 21.01.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US43795289 | 17.11.1989 | US59239790 | 03.10.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5016092 | 14.05.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | US43795289 | 17.11.1989 | US59239790 | 03.10.1990 | Type | Earlier application | EP0434209 |