EP0668703 - Video comb filter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.1999 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: DE | published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RCA Thomson Licensing Corporation 2 Independence Way Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | [1999/03] |
Former [1995/34] | For all designated states RCA Thomson Licensing Corporation 2 Independence Way Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Perlman, Stuart Stanley 487 Prospect Avenue Princeton, New Jersey 08540 / US | [1995/34] | Representative(s) | Wördemann, Hermes, et al Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/37] | Wördemann, Hermes, Dipl.-Ing., et al Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH, Licensing & Intellectual Property, Göttinger Chaussee 76 30453 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [1996/14] | Ahrens, Thomas, et al Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH, Patent Department, Göttinger Chaussee 76 D-30453 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [1995/34] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 95201177.3 | 16.11.1990 | [1995/34] | Priority number, date | US19890437952 | 17.11.1989 Original published format: US 437952 | US19900592397 | 03.10.1990 Original published format: US 592397 | [1995/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0668703 | Date: | 23.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0668703 | Date: | 04.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0668703 | Date: | 20.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/78 | [1995/34] | CPC: |
H04N9/78 (EP,KR,US);
H04N9/642 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1995/34] | Title | German: | Videokammfilter | [1995/34] | English: | Video comb filter | [1995/34] | French: | Filtre en peigne vidéo | [1995/34] | Examination procedure | 02.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/18] | 09.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP90312507.8 / EP0434209 | Opposition(s) | 21.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2008/13] |
Former [2000/12] | DE | 21.04.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS61290892 ; | [A]EP0153757 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1,6 * page 13, line 23 - page 19, line 7 *; | [PA]EP0362747 (RCA LICENSING CORP [US]) [PA] 1,6 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870519), vol. 11, no. 154, Database accession no. (E - 508), & JP61290892 A 00000000 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1,6 * abstract * | [A] - NAKAJIMA & AL., "improvement of picture quality for ntsc and pal systems by digital signal processing", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, NEW YORK, (198511), vol. CE-31, no. 4, pages 642 - 653 [A] 1,6 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0004] * |