EP0686779 - Fastening element for hardware parts and hinge embodying such elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ferrari, Franco Frazione Deviscio, 2 22053 Lecco (Como) / IT | [2000/31] |
Former [1995/50] | For all designated states Ferrari, Franco Frazione Deviscio, 2 I-22053 Lecco (Como) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ferrari, Franco Frazione Deviscio, 2 I-22053 Lecco / IT | 02 /
Migli, Carlo Via del Pozzo, 8 I-22053 Lecco / IT | [1995/50] | Representative(s) | Faraggiana, Vittorio Ingg. Guzzi & Ravizza S.r.l. Via Vincenzo Monti 8 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/50] | Faraggiana, Vittorio, Dr. Ing. Ingg. Guzzi & Ravizza S.r.l. Via Vincenzo Monti 8 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 95201230.0 | 11.05.1995 | [1995/50] | Priority number, date | IT1994MI00353U | 13.05.1994 Original published format: IT MI940353 U | [1995/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0686779 | Date: | 13.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0686779 | Date: | 23.10.1996 | [1996/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0686779 | Date: | 02.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F16B21/04 | [1995/50] | CPC: |
E05D5/0276 (EP,US);
A47B88/423 (EP,US);
F16B21/02 (EP,US);
A47B2230/0033 (EP,US);
A47B2230/0044 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/20 (EP,US);
F16B2/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, PT, SE [1995/50] | Extension states | SI | 11.05.1995 | Title | German: | Befestigungselement für Beschläge, sowie mit solchen Elementen ausgerüstetes Scharnier | [1995/50] | English: | Fastening element for hardware parts and hinge embodying such elements | [1995/50] | French: | Dispositif de fixation pour ferrures, et charnière comportant de tels éléments | [1995/50] | Examination procedure | 13.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/07] | 08.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.07.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 21.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/29] | Request for further processing for: | 09.08.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 09.08.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.10.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.08.2000 | FR | 02.08.2000 | GR | 02.08.2000 | PT | 02.11.2000 | SE | 02.11.2000 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/07] | AT | 02.08.2000 | |
GR | 02.08.2000 | ||
PT | 02.11.2000 | ||
SE | 02.11.2000 | ||
FR | 29.12.2000 | ||
Former [2001/27] | AT | 02.08.2000 | |
PT | 02.11.2000 | ||
SE | 02.11.2000 | ||
FR | 29.12.2000 | ||
Former [2001/24] | AT | 02.08.2000 | |
PT | 02.11.2000 | ||
FR | 29.12.2000 | ||
Former [2001/18] | AT | 02.08.2000 | |
PT | 02.11.2000 | ||
Former [2001/17] | AT | 02.08.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1920865U (RAYMOND DRUCKNOPF UND METALLWA [DE]) [A] 5-7* the whole document *; | [XA]GB1187430 (PAINTON & CO LTD) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 4,8-10; | [A]FR2249569 (ROSELLA ETIENNE [FR]) [A] 1-3 * figures 1-3; claims 1-4 *; | [A]FR2502675 (SALICE ARTURO SPA [IT]) [A] 1-4,14,15 * figures 1-14; claims 1-10 *; | [A]FR2561325 (USM CORP [US]) [A] 1,4,11,12 * the whole document *; | [XA]EP0524412 (SALICE ARTURO SPA [IT]) [X] 1 * column W * [A] 2-4,8-15 |