EP0695917 - Portable air-conditioning equipment for living areas [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carrier S.p.A. Via Pontaccio, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [1996/44] |
Former [1996/06] | For all designated states DELCHI/CARRIER S.p.A. Via Pontaccio, 10 I-20121 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Redaelli, Giovanni Via Mozart, 29 I-20052 Monza (Milano) / IT | [1996/06] | Representative(s) | Siniscalco, Fabio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato 8 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/16] | Siniscalco, Fabio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2000/37] | Perani, Aurelio, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A Via Senato 8 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2000/33] | De Nova, Roberto, et al Jacobacci & Perani, Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1996/06] | De Nova, Roberto, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Via Visconti di Modrone 7 I-20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 95201383.7 | 26.05.1995 | [1996/06] | Priority number, date | IT1994MI01673 | 01.08.1994 Original published format: IT MI941673 | [1996/06] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0695917 | Date: | 07.02.1996 | [1996/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0695917 | Date: | 13.03.1996 | [1996/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0695917 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F24F1/02 | [1996/06] | CPC: |
F24F1/32 (EP);
F24F1/0003 (EP);
F24F1/022 (EP);
F24F1/04 (EP);
F24F1/34 (EP);
F24F1/46 (EP);
F24F2221/125 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [1996/06] | Title | German: | Tragbares Klimagerät für Wohnräume | [1996/06] | English: | Portable air-conditioning equipment for living areas | [1996/06] | French: | Dispositif portable de conditionnement d'air pour espaces habitables | [1996/06] | Examination procedure | 12.04.1996 | Examination requested [1997/02] | 29.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4138859 (PIETSCH JOSEPH A) [X] 1,2 * column W *; | [DA]EP0408999 (DELCHI CARRIER SPA [IT]) [DA] 3-5 * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 14; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0468576 (OLIMPIA SRL [IT]) [A] 3-6* column 2, line 12 - column 53; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US5313806 (FENG CHUN [CN]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 4; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | EP0408999 |