EP0686545 - Sideboard latching means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1999 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.V. Henschel Engineering S.A., naamloze vennootschap Boomsesteenweg 604-606 2610 Wilrijk / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/50] | For all designated states N.V. HENSCHEL ENGINEERING S.A. Boomsesteenweg 604-606 B-2610 Wilrijk / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Patt, Frank N.V.Henschel Enginnering S.A. Boomsesteenweg 604-606 B-2610 Wilrijk / BE | [1995/50] | Representative(s) | Donné, Eddy Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv. Arenbergstraat 13 2000 Antwerpen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/50] | Donné, Eddy Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv Arenbergstraat 13 B-2000 Antwerpen / BE | Application number, filing date | 95201385.2 | 26.05.1995 | [1995/50] | Priority number, date | BE19940000564 | 07.06.1994 Original published format: BE 9400564 | [1995/50] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0686545 | Date: | 13.12.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0686545 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B62D33/02 | [1995/50] | CPC: |
B62D33/037 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT, NL [1995/50] | Title | German: | Bordwandverschluss | [1995/50] | English: | Sideboard latching means | [1995/50] | French: | Fermeture de paroi latérale | [1995/50] | Examination procedure | 05.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/11] | 27.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 09.09.1998 | IT | 09.09.1998 | ES | 18.03.1999 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 09.09.1998 | |
ES | 18.03.1999 | ||
Former [2004/04] | FR | 05.02.1999 | |
ES | 18.03.1999 | ||
Former [1999/36] | FR | 05.02.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3045865 (BERGMEISTER) [Y] 1-3 * page 12, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3; figure 2 *; | [Y]DE9016416U (HESTERBERG) [Y] 1-3 * page 4, paragraph L - page 5, paragraph 1; figure 2 *; | [A]DK86305 (BARSLEV) [A] 1 * figures 3,4 *; | [A]EP0585952 (HESTERBERG) [A] 1 * figure 7 * |