EP0745901 - A concentrated dampening solution with an improved shelf life for printing with a lithographic printing plate obtained according to the silver salt diffusion transfer process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2000 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.03.2000 [2000/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert N.V. Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/11] | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT N.V. Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | ||
Former [1996/49] | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT naamloze vennootschap Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Hunsel, Johan c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V., IIE 3800, Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel / BE | 02 /
Mortelmans, Paul c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V., IIE 3800, Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel / BE | [1996/49] | Application number, filing date | 95201423.1 | 31.05.1995 | [1996/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0745901 | Date: | 04.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0745901 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/07, B41N3/08 | [1996/49] | CPC: |
B41N3/08 (EP,US);
G03F7/07 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/49] | Title | German: | Feuchtwasserkonzentrat mit verbesserter Lagerfähigkeit für den Lithodruck mit nach dem Silberdiffusiontransferverfahren hergestellten Druckplatten | [1996/49] | English: | A concentrated dampening solution with an improved shelf life for printing with a lithographic printing plate obtained according to the silver salt diffusion transfer process | [1996/49] | French: | Concentré d'une solution de mouillage avec stabilité de stockage accrue pour l'impression lithographique avec plaques obtenus selon le procédé par diffusion de transfert argentique | [1996/49] | Examination procedure | 04.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/32] | 29.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0598241 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] * page 74 *; | [A]EP0549831 (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [A] * page 11 * | by applicant | JPS4830562 | JPS5321602 | JPS54103104 | JPS569750 | US2352014 | EP0423399 | EP0410500 | US4722535 | GB1241661 | US3829319 | US4238279 | EP0304662 | US5059508 | BE493464 | US2095854 | US2095856 | US2955939 | US3482978 | US3552974 | US3573921 | US3582344 | US3623881 | US3695888 | EP0554585 | US4092168 | US4311787 | DE2453217 | US4063952 | US4960683 | EP0547662 | DE1228927 | US4563410 | US3038805 | US4038075 | US4292400 | US4975354 | - R. KOSLOWSKY, Z. WISS. PHOTOGR. PHOTOPHYS. PHOTOCHEM., (1951), vol. 46, pages 65 - 72 | - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, (1988), vol. 289, no. 052 | - BIRR, Z. WISS. PHOTOGR. PHOTOPHYS. PHOTOCHEM., (1952), vol. 47, pages 2 - 27 | - Product Licensing Index, (1971), vol. 92, pages 107 - 109 |