EP0672722 - Polyphenylene sulfide resin composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.10.1997 [1997/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE PLASTICS JAPAN LTD. Itohpia Nihonbashi-Honcho Building 2-7-1 Nihonbashi-Honcho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | [1995/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inuoe, Kazunari 3554-12 Kumakura-cho Moka-city, Tochigi Prefecture / JP | 02 /
Saito, Akihiro 1-6-1 Shimoguri, No. 8 President Bldg. No 301 Utsunomiya-city, Tochigi Prefecture / JP | 03 /
Morioka, Masataka 348 Kami-kohmagi Moka-city, Tochigi Prefecture / JP | [1995/44] |
Former [1995/38] | 01 /
Inoue, Kazunari 516-3 Kamimita-cho Utsunomiya City, Tochigi Prefecture / JP | ||
02 /
Saito, Akihiro 3413-84 Ishiimachi Utsunomiya City, Tochigi Prefecture / JP | |||
03 /
Morioka, Masataka 13-7 Daimachi Moka City Tochigi Prefecture / JP | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1995/38] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 95201490.0 | 07.11.1989 | [1995/38] | Priority number, date | JP19880280340 | 08.11.1988 Original published format: JP 28034088 | JP19890041649 | 23.02.1989 Original published format: JP 4164989 | JP19890043200 | 27.02.1989 Original published format: JP 4320089 | JP19890045489 | 28.02.1989 Original published format: JP 4548989 | JP19890115173 | 10.05.1989 Original published format: JP 11517389 | JP19890128943 | 24.05.1989 Original published format: JP 12894389 | JP19890188883 | 24.07.1989 Original published format: JP 18888389 | JP19890198726 | 31.07.1989 Original published format: JP 19872689 | JP19890205620 | 10.08.1989 Original published format: JP 20562089 | [1995/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0672722 | Date: | 20.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0672722 | Date: | 25.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C08L81/02, C08L71/12, C08L77/00 | [1995/42] | CPC: |
C08L71/12 (EP);
C08L71/126 (EP);
C08L81/02 (EP);
C08L25/06 (EP);
C08L77/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L71/126, C08L81/00 (EP);
C08L71/12, C08L2666/14 (EP);
C08L71/12, C08L81/00 (EP);
C08L81/02, C08L2666/04 (EP); |
Former IPC [1995/38] | C08L71/12, C08L81/02, C08L77/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/38] | Title | German: | Polyphenylensulfid-Harzzusammensetzung | [1995/38] | English: | Polyphenylene sulfide resin composition | [1995/38] | French: | Composition de résine de polysulfure de phénylène | [1995/38] | Examination procedure | 06.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/38] | 11.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/43] | 27.05.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/43] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP89202806.9 / EP0368413 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1996 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0024120 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1 * claim - * | by applicant | JPS50156561 | JPS5369255 | JPS59213758 | US2513188 | JPS4427671B | JPS453368B | US3274165 | US1160660 | JPS4627255B | BE29437 | JPS63125525 | WO8707286 |