EP0686867 - All fiber in-line optical isolator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.2002 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.2002 [2002/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CeramOptec GmbH Siemensstrasse 8 53121 Bonn / DE | [2001/41] |
Former [1995/50] | For all designated states CeramOptec GmbH Siemenstrasse 8 D-53121 Bonn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krivoshlykov, Sergej G. Altufievskoje Shosse 34-A, Flat 54 Moscow, 127562 / RU | [1995/50] | Application number, filing date | 95201516.2 | 08.06.1995 | [1995/50] | Priority number, date | US19940257347 | 09.06.1994 Original published format: US 257347 | [1995/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0686867 | Date: | 13.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0686867 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/095 | [1995/50] | CPC: |
G02F1/0118 (EP,US);
G02F1/0955 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1995/50] | Title | German: | Faseroptischer Isolator | [1995/50] | English: | All fiber in-line optical isolator | [1995/50] | French: | Isolateur à fibre optique | [1995/50] | Examination procedure | 12.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/32] | 11.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3990777 (AURACHER FRANZ) [A] 1,4 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 47 * * figure 3 *; | [A]EP0296676 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE], et al) [A] 1,4 * column 3, line 1 - line 23 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0112223 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [A] 1,4 * claim 1 *; | [A]JPH0561002 | [A] - V. PRIYE AND M. TSUTSUMI, "NONRECIPROCAL BEHAVIOUR OF LEAKY GYROTROPIC WAVEGUIDE", ELECTRONICS LETTERS., STEVENAGE GB, (19930107), vol. 29, no. 1, pages 104 - 105, XP000403941 [A] 1,4,7 * the whole document * | [AD] - W. JOHNSTONE ET AL., "FIBRE OPTIC WAVELENGTH CHANNEL SELECTOR WITH HIGH RESOLUTION", ELECTRONICS LETTERS., STEVENAGE GB, (19920702), vol. 28, no. 14, pages 1364 - 1365, XP000319067 [AD] 1,4 * the whole document * | [A] - T. SHINTAKU AND T. UNO, "Directional Coupler Type Optical Circulator", TRANSACTIONS OF THE INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS AND COMMUNICATION ENGINEERS OF JAPAN, SECTION E, TOKYO JP, (199004), vol. E73, no. 4, pages 474 - 476, XP000132745 [A] 1,4 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930312), vol. 17, no. 372, Database accession no. (P - 1573), & JP05061002 A 00000000 (MATSUSHITA) [A] 7 * abstract * | by applicant | US4859013 | - LASER FOCAS, (1978), vol. 14, no. 11, page 52 | - J. LIGHTWAVE TECHN., (1984), vol. 27, no. 56 | - ELECTRONICS LETT., (1992), vol. 28, page 1364 |