EP0691131 - Babesia vaccine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.09.2000 [2000/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [1999/40] |
Former [1996/02] | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schetters, Theodorus Petrus Maria Heggerank 17 NL-5432 CD Cuyk / NL | [1996/02] | Representative(s) | Hermans, Frans G.M., et al Patent Department N.V. Organon P.O. Box 20 5340 BH Oss / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1996/02] | Hermans, Franciscus G.M., et al P.O. Box 20 NL-5340 BH Oss / NL | Application number, filing date | 95201817.4 | 04.07.1995 | [1996/02] | Priority number, date | EP19940201944 | 06.07.1994 Original published format: EP 94201944 | [1996/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0691131 | Date: | 10.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0691131 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/018 | [1996/02] | CPC: |
A61K39/018 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, GR, IT, NL, PT [1996/02] | Title | German: | Babesia-Impfstoff | [1996/02] | English: | Babesia vaccine | [1996/02] | French: | Vaccin à base de babesia | [1996/02] | Examination procedure | 04.07.1995 | Examination requested [1996/02] | 11.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0220988 (RHONE MERIEUX [FR]) [DA] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0018579 (UNIV ILLINOIS [US]) [A] 1-6 * claims 1-9 * | [DA] - G. UILENBERG ET AL., "THREE GROUPS OF BABESIA CANIS DISTINGUISHED AND A PROPOSAL FOR NOMENCLATURE.", BIOLOGICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 88, no. 2, Database accession no. 16375, page AB-542 [DA] 1-6 * abstract * | [ ] - THE VETERINARY QUARTERLY, vol. 11, no. 1, pages 33 - 40 | by applicant | US4777036 |