EP0685489 - Tripeptide antithrombotic agents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2002 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.12.2002 [2002/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/49] | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, Indiana 46285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gesellchen, Paul David 3816 Haverhill Drive Indianapolis, Indiana 46240 / US | 02 /
Shuman, Robert Theodore 2596 Willow Street Greenwood, Indiana 46142 / US | [1995/49] | Representative(s) | Pritchard, Judith, et al Eli Lilly and Company Limited Lilly Research Centre Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | Pritchard, Judith, et al Eli Lilly and Company Limited Lilly Research Centre Erl Wood Manor Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | ||
Former [1995/49] | Hudson, Christopher Mark, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 95201960.2 | 26.09.1991 | [1995/49] | Priority number, date | US19900589553 | 28.09.1990 Original published format: US 589553 | US19910756091 | 06.09.1991 Original published format: US 756091 | [1995/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0685489 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0685489 | Date: | 10.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0685489 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/08 | [1996/11] | CPC: |
C07K5/0812 (EP);
C07K5/08 (KR);
A61K38/06 (KR);
A61P7/02 (EP);
C07K5/06078 (EP);
C07K5/06139 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1995/49] | C07K5/08, A61K38/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1995/49] | Title | German: | Tripeptidisches antithrombotisches Mittel | [1995/49] | English: | Tripeptide antithrombotic agents | [1995/49] | French: | Tripeptide, qui est un agent antithrombotique | [1995/49] | Examination procedure | 17.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/49] | 07.02.1996 | New documents discovered [1996/13] | 05.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.02.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 29.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP91308785.4 / EP0479489 | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50] | Request for further processing for: | 08.02.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 26.01.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.05.2001 | Decision despatched | 23.04.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 23.04.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.05.1999 | Decision despatched | 03.11.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 03.11.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 17.11.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 03.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1996 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   13.11.1996 | 30.09.1997 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   07.11.1997 | 30.09.1999 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   11.11.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0185390 (RICHTER GEDEON VEGYESZET [HU]) [A] 1-3; | [A]EP0335662 (BRITISH TECH GROUP [GB]) [A] 1-3; | [A]DE3827415 (BEHRINGWERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1,2; | [A]EP0367713 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH])[A] 3 | Examination | US4346078 | - J MED CHEM, (1990), pages 1729 - 1735 |