EP0700956 - Silica reinforced rubber composition containing salts of salicylic acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.05.2001 [2001/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company 1144 East Market Street Akron, OH 44316-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY 1144 East Market Street Akron, Ohio 44316-0001 / US | ||
Former [1996/11] | For all designated states THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY 1144 East Market Street Akron, Ohio 44316-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wideman, Lawson Gibson 82 North Village View Tallmadge, OH 44278 / US | 02 /
Sandstrom, Paul Harry 96 Milton Drive Tallmadge, OH 44278 / US | [1996/11] | Representative(s) | Leitz, Paul Goodyear Technical Center, Patent Department, Avenue Gordon Smith 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1996/11] | Leitz, Paul Goodyear Technical Center, Patent Department, Avenue Gordon Smith L-7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | Application number, filing date | 95202334.9 | 29.08.1995 | [1996/11] | Priority number, date | US19940300767 | 06.09.1994 Original published format: US 300767 | [1996/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0700956 | Date: | 13.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0700956 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/098, C08L21/00, C08K3/36 | [1996/11] | CPC: |
C08K5/098 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/098, C08L21/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/11] | Title | German: | Mit Kieselsäure verstärkte Gummimischung, welche Salicylsäuresalzen enthält | [1996/11] | English: | Silica reinforced rubber composition containing salts of salicylic acid | [1996/11] | French: | Composition de caoutchouc renforcé de silice contenant de sels d'acides salicique | [1996/11] | Examination procedure | 29.08.1995 | Examination requested [1996/11] | 27.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4390648 (STACY CARL J) [X] 1-10 * column 2, line 38 - line 40; claim 1 * * column 5, line 68 * * column 6, line 29 - line 35 *; | [A]FR2311797 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 39; claims 1,4,8 * | by applicant | US3451458 | US3664403 | US3768537 | US3884285 | US3938574 | US4482663 | US4590052 | US5089554 | GB1424503 | US4207218 | US5087668 | - R.O. NORWALK, Vanderbilt Rubber Handbook, R.T. VANDERBILT COMPANY, INC., (1990), pages 554 - 557 | - R.O. NORWALK, Vanderbilt Rubber Handbook, R.T. VANDERBILT COMPANY, INC., (1990), page 555 |