EP0700942 - Star polymer viscosity index improver for lubricating oil compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/22] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1996/11] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Handlin, Dale Lee, Jr. 12223 Waldemar Houston, Texas 77077 / US | 02 /
Rhodos, Robert Barnett 11735 Normont Drive Houston, Texas 77070 / US | 03 /
Stevens, Craig Aldred 19515 Mills Meadow Lane Houston, Texas 77094 / US | [1996/11] | Application number, filing date | 95202388.5 | 04.09.1995 | [1996/11] | Priority number, date | US19940303972 | 09.09.1994 Original published format: US 303972 | [1996/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0700942 | Date: | 13.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0700942 | Date: | 29.10.1997 | [1997/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0700942 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C08F297/02, C10M143/12, C10M143/10 | [1997/43] | CPC: |
C08F297/046 (EP,US);
C08F297/02 (KR);
C10M143/12 (EP,US);
C10M2205/06 (EP,US);
C10N2040/02 (EP,US);
C10N2040/08 (EP,US);
C10N2040/25 (EP,US);
C10N2040/251 (EP,US);
C10N2040/255 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1996/11] | C08F297/02, C10M143/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1996/11] | Title | German: | Sternförmiges Polymer als Viskositätsindexverbesserer für Schmierölzusammensetzungen | [1996/11] | English: | Star polymer viscosity index improver for lubricating oil compositions | [1996/11] | French: | Polymère en étoile en tant qu'agent améliorant l'indice de viscosité pour compositions des huiles lubrifiantes | [1996/11] | Examination procedure | 05.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/18] | 27.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 04.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.06.1999 | CH | 02.06.1999 | GR | 02.06.1999 | LI | 02.06.1999 | SE | 02.06.1999 | DK | 02.09.1999 | PT | 02.09.1999 | IE | 04.09.1999 | LU | 04.09.1999 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 02.06.1999 | |
CH | 02.06.1999 | ||
GR | 02.06.1999 | ||
LI | 02.06.1999 | ||
SE | 02.06.1999 | ||
DK | 02.09.1999 | ||
PT | 02.09.1999 | ||
IE | 04.09.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 02.06.1999 | |
CH | 02.06.1999 | ||
GR | 02.06.1999 | ||
LI | 02.06.1999 | ||
SE | 02.06.1999 | ||
PT | 02.09.1999 | ||
IE | 04.09.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 02.06.1999 | |
CH | 02.06.1999 | ||
GR | 02.06.1999 | ||
LI | 02.06.1999 | ||
PT | 02.09.1999 | ||
IE | 04.09.1999 | ||
Former [2001/12] | AT | 02.06.1999 | |
CH | 02.06.1999 | ||
LI | 02.06.1999 | ||
PT | 02.09.1999 | ||
IE | 04.09.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 02.06.1999 | |
CH | 02.06.1999 | ||
LI | 02.06.1999 | ||
PT | 02.09.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 02.06.1999 | |
PT | 02.09.1999 | ||
CH | 07.09.1999 | ||
LI | 07.09.1999 | ||
Former [2000/25] | AT | 02.06.1999 | |
PT | 02.09.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | AT | 02.06.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4116917 (ECKERT RUDOLF J A) [AD] 1-14; | [A]EP0413294 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [A] 1; | [A]US5147939 (HELLERMANN WALTER [DE], et al)[A] 1 | by applicant | US385083 | CA716645 | USRE27145E | US3772196 | US4116917 | EP0296714 |