EP0731203 - A condensation laundry dryer with arrangements for collecting condensation water in a container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2001 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.10.2001 [2001/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Candy S.p.A. Via Missori, 8 20052 Monza (MI) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/37] | For all designated states CANDY S.p.A. Via Missori, 8 I-20052 Monza (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fumagalli, Silvano Via Grigna, 2 I-20052 Monza, Milano / IT | [1996/37] | Representative(s) | Perani, Aurelio, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A Via Senato 8 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/27] | Perani, Aurelio, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A Via Visconti di Modrone, 7 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1996/37] | Falcetti, Carlo, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Via Visconti di Modrone, 7 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 95202389.3 | 05.09.1995 | [1996/37] | Priority number, date | IT1995MI00452 | 09.03.1995 Original published format: IT MI950452 | [1996/37] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0731203 | Date: | 11.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0731203 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | D06F58/24, D06F39/14 | [1996/37] | CPC: |
D06F39/14 (EP,US);
D06F58/24 (EP,US);
D06F34/20 (EP,US);
D06F37/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, IT [1996/37] | Title | German: | Wäschetrockner mit Kondensationseinrichtung mit Kondensat-Sammelgefässvorrichtung | [1996/37] | English: | A condensation laundry dryer with arrangements for collecting condensation water in a container | [1996/37] | French: | Sèche-linge à condensation avec dispositif pour recueillir l'eau de condensation dans un conteneur | [1996/37] | Examination procedure | 19.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/47] | 01.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.02.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2933513 (MIELE & CIE) [A] 1,5 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]GB2115127 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE) [A] 1,5 * page 2, line 23 - line 91; figure 1 *; | [A]DE3708516 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1,11* abstract *; | [XA]EP0484225 (CIAPEM [FR]) [X] 1,10 * figure -; claim - * [A] 3,4,6 |