EP0767512 - Ground wire attachment to shield for cable assembly and method to produce same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.1998 [1998/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BERG ELECTRONICS MANUFACTURING B.V. P.O. Box 2060 5202 CB s'-Hertogenbosch / NL | [1997/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Loman, Martinus Hendricus Vlasgaard 6 NL-5345 AV Oss / NL | [1997/15] | Representative(s) | de Bruijn, Leendert C., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1997/15] | de Bruijn, Leendert C., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 2517 KZ Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 95202655.7 | 03.10.1995 | [1997/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0767512 | Date: | 09.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01R9/05, H01R13/658 | [1997/15] | CPC: |
H01R9/0518 (EP);
H01R13/6582 (EP);
H01R13/6593 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | GB [1997/15] | Title | German: | Erdkabel Befestigung an die Abschirmung eines Kabelszusammenbau und deren Herstellungsverfahren | [1997/15] | English: | Ground wire attachment to shield for cable assembly and method to produce same | [1997/15] | French: | Attache d'un fil de terre au blindage d'un assemblage de câble et méthode de production | [1997/15] | Examination procedure | 10.10.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/31] | 19.02.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1998/31] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.11.1997 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1997 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0224200 (STEWART STAMPING CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,6 * page 6, column 9, line 7 - line 33 * * page 7, column 12, line 29 - line 55 * * page 8, column 14, line 15 - page 9, column 15, line 44; figures 1,6 * [Y] 5; | [YA]EP0168649 (JAPAN AVIATION ELECTRON [JP], et al) [Y] 5 * page 8, line 4 - line 26; figures 10,11 * [A] 1-4,6 |