EP0708541 - Transmission system with a controlling loop [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/38] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | ||
Former [1997/09] | For all designated states Lucent Technologies Inc. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | ||
Former [1996/17] | For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 D-22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Urbansky, Ralph, Dr. Ing., c/o Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Röntgenstrasse 24 D-22335 Hamburg / DE | [1996/17] | Representative(s) | Sarup, David Alexander Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd Patent Business c/o Nokia 125 Finsbury Pavement London EC2A 1NQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Sarup, David Alexander Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield EN3 7XU / GB | ||
Former [2006/33] | Sarup, David Alexander Lucent Technologies EUR-IP UK Ltd Unit 18, Core 3 Workzone Innova Business Park Elecric Avenue Enfield, EN3 7XU / GB | ||
Former [1997/09] | Tergau, Enno, Dipl.-Ing., et al Tergau & Pohl Patentanwälte Mögeldorfer Hauptstrasse 51 90482 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [1996/17] | Volmer, Georg, Dipl.-Ing., et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Röntgenstrasse 24 D-22335 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 95202717.5 | 10.10.1995 | [1996/17] | Priority number, date | DE19944437136 | 18.10.1994 Original published format: DE 4437136 | [1996/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0708541 | Date: | 24.04.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0708541 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/07 | [1996/17] | CPC: |
H04J3/076 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/17] | Title | German: | Übertragungssystem mit einem Regelkreis | [1996/17] | English: | Transmission system with a controlling loop | [1996/17] | French: | Système de transmission avec une boucle de commande | [1996/17] | Examination procedure | 24.10.1996 | Examination requested [1996/51] | 07.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 20.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0435384 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 5, line 14 - line 58 *; | [AD]EP0507385 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE], et al) [AD] 1-13* column 5, line 20 - column 7, line 39 *; | [X]WO9316536 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI]) [X] 1,13 * page 5, line 2 - line 11 * * page 5, line 19 - line 32 * * page 9, line 16 - page 11, line 27 *; | [PX]EP0630127 (BELL TELEPHONE MFG [BE]) [PX] 1,13 * column 3, line 25 - line 46 * * column 7, line 49 - column 11, line 7 * | [A] - URBANSKY R ET AL, "Simulation results and field trial experience of justification jitter (SDH networks)", SPEAKERS' PAPERS. 6TH WORLD TELECOMMUNICATION FORUM. PART 2. TECHNICAL SYMPOSIUM. INTEGRATION, INTEROPERATION AND INTERCONNECTION: THE WAY TO GLOBAL SERVICES, GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, 10-15 OCT. 1991, 1991, GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, INT. TELECOMMUN. UNION, SWITZERLAND, pages 45 - 49 vol.3 [A] 1-13 * page 47, paragraph 3.3 - page 48 * |