EP0770494 - A method for making a lithographic printing plate involving on press development [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.2001 [2001/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert N.V. Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT N.V. Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | ||
Former [1997/18] | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT naamloze vennootschap Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vermeersch, Joan, c/o Agfa Gevaert N.V. IIE 3800, Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | 02 /
Van Damme, Marc, c/o Agfa Gevaert N.V. IIE 3800, Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [1997/18] | Application number, filing date | 95202874.4 | 24.10.1995 | [1997/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0770494 | Date: | 02.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0770494 | Date: | 07.05.1997 | [1997/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0770494 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/36, B41C1/10 | [1997/18] | CPC: |
B41C1/1025 (EP);
B41M5/366 (EP);
B41C2210/04 (EP);
B41C2210/08 (EP);
B41C2210/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1997/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer lithographische Druckplatte mit auf der Druckpresse stattfindenden Entwicklung | [1997/18] | English: | A method for making a lithographic printing plate involving on press development | [1997/18] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'une plaque lithographique avec développement sur presse | [1997/18] | Examination procedure | 07.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/02] | 08.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4034183 (UHLIG FRITZ) [X] 1-9 * column 2, line 11 - line 36 * [Y] 1-9; | [XY]US4063949 (UHLIG FRITZ ET AL) [X] 1-9 * column 3, line 55 - line 65 * [Y] 1-9; | [Y]FR1561957 (GEVAERT-AGFA N.V.) [Y] 1-9 * résumé *; page 7, column R, line 38 * * page 7, column L, line 15 - line 53 *; | [A]EP0580393 (PRESSTEK INC) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3438882 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG) [A] 1; | [E]EP0703499 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG) [E] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9418005 (AGFA-GEVAERT N.V.) [A] 1 * page 1, line 28 - page 2, line 24 *; | [E]EP0689096 (EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY) [E] 1-9 * the whole document * |