EP0711795 - Low viscosity adhesive compositions containing asymmetric radial polymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1999 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.01.2000 [2000/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/04] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1996/20] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chin, Steven Soohyun 8106 Megan Place Houston, TX 77095 / US | 02 /
Hoxmeier, Ronald James 2823 Waypark Drive Houston, TX 77082 / US | 03 /
Southwick, Jeffrey George 1811 Laguna Meadows Lane Houston, TX 77094 / US | 04 /
Spence, Bridget Ann 2142 Branard Avenue Houston, TX 77098 / US | [1996/20] | Application number, filing date | 95202993.2 | 06.11.1995 | [1996/20] | Priority number, date | US19940336458 | 09.11.1994 Original published format: US 336458 | [1996/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0711795 | Date: | 15.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0711795 | Date: | 27.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C08G81/02, C08F297/04, C09J153/02 | [1996/20] | CPC: |
C08F297/044 (EP,KR,US);
C09J153/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08L2666/02 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C09J153/02, C08L2666/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/20] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzungen von Klebstoffen mit geringer Viscosität die asymmetrische radiale Polymere enthalten | [1996/20] | English: | Low viscosity adhesive compositions containing asymmetric radial polymers | [1996/20] | French: | Compositions adhésives de basse viscosité comprenant des polymères asymétriques radiaux | [1996/20] | Examination procedure | 02.10.1996 | Examination requested [1996/49] | 05.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0255001 (MONTEDIPE SPA [IT]) [X] 1 * example 1; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0312928 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1 * page 2, lines 14-17 * * page 3, line 53 - page 4, line 4; example 1; claim 1 *; | [X]WO8909242 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0540109 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [X] 1 * column W *; | [X]WO9417115 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [PX]US5369175 (HOXIMEIER RONALD J [US], et al) [PX] 1* column W *; | [PX]EP0653453 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [PX] 1 * column W * | by applicant | US3150209 | US3231635 | US3239478 | US3265765 | US3322856 | US3496154 | US3498960 | US3577398 | USRE27145E | US4096203 | US4145298 | US4238202 | US4391949 | EP0314256 | US5039755 | US5229464 |